SLPR v. San Diego Unified, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01327
Filed: June 26, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2011 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 251 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying 287 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. After a thorough review of the record and the reasons stated herein, the Court grants Navy's summary judgment motion, and denies Plai ntiffs' cross motion on the fourth cause of action. The Court grants in part and denies in part, the Navy's motion to strike certain extra-record documents. This order resolves the final cause of action in the Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/2/2011. (leh)
March 17, 2011 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 305 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 318 Motion for Summary Judgment on Sixth Cause of Action. Upon due consideration of the parties' memoranda and exhibits, a thorough review of the administrative record, the Court de nies Plaintiff SLPR, LLC's motion for summary judgment on the sixth cause of action and Grants Defendant United States Army Corp of Engineer's cross-motion for summary judgment on the sixth cause of action. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/17/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 30, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 284 Plaintiffs' Objections to 8/10/2010 Order of United States Magistrate Judge: Based on the foregoing stated herein, the Court Overrules Plaintiffs' objections to the assigned Magistrate Judge's 8/10/2010 Order. In addition, the Court denies Plaintiffs' discovery motion in its entirety. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/27/2010.(leh)
August 10, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 242 Motion for Discovery - Motion to Permit Reliance Upon Expert Testimony and Limited Discovery. It is hereby ordered that the Court hereby confirms the dates set forth in Judge Anello's 7/15/2010 briefing schedule for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. The Court hereby vacates the discovery dates set forth in paragraphs 2-5 of the 9/14/2009 Scheduling Order (Doc. 174 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/10/2010. (leh)
June 8, 2010 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 191 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Federal Defendants. Based on the foregoing stated herein, the Court finds that Federal Defendants fail to demonstrate that they are entitled to relief pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). Accordingly, the Court denies Federal Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/8/2010. (leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLPR v. San Diego Unified, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?