Carter v. Ylst

Case Number: 3:2006cv01343
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 174 MOTION to Vacate, Alter, Amend Final Orders and Judgment. The Court also hereby vacates the June 3, 2013 hearing date on this motion. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/31/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
March 18, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER: (1) Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and (2) Issuing Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/18/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
October 5, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Petitioner's 151 Motion for Reconsideration; (2) Granting Petitioner's Request for Supplemental Merits briefing; and (3) Setting Briefing Schedule. In accordance with the timelines previously set forth in the Court' ;s November 8, 2010 Order, Petitioner's Opening Brief shall be filed on or before November 18, 2011. Respondent's Opposition or Response shall be filed within 20 days from the date the Opening Brief is filed, and the Reply shall be filed within 15 days after the filing of the responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
August 12, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 112 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/12/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
July 25, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 118 Motion for Discovery without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/25/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Ylst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?