Stiefel v. Bechtel Corporation

Case Number: 3:2006cv01414
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2008 62 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 61 Notice of Change of Address (ag)
May 13, 2008 61 NOTICE of Change of Address as to James Richard Stiefel. NUNC PRO TUNC 05/12/2008. Attorney Stephen Danz made the Notice of Change of Address but is not appearing in the case. Attorney Marcus Jackson works for Stephen Danz & Associates but at the San Diego office. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(ag) Modified on 5/14/2008 to note that there is not a change of address needed in this case for Attorney Stephen Danz, he will not be appearing in this case. Notice of Change of Address for this attorney was forwarded to attorney maintenance (ag).
May 13, 2008 60 Discrepancy Order by Judge Marilyn L. Huff accepting document: Change of Address from Plaintiff James Richard Stiefel, non-compliance with local rule Other: Case Closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 05/13/08. (ag)
August 10, 2007 59 Costs Taxed in amount of $2,612.06 against plaintiff James Richard Stiefel (nsp)
August 9, 2007 58 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by James Richard Stiefel re 55 Objection to Bill of Costs filed by James Richard Stiefel. (nsp)
August 8, 2007 57 DECLARATION of Thomas M. McInterney in Support of Cost Bill filed by Bechtel Corporation. (McInerney, Thomas) Modified on 8/10/2007 to correct attorneys docket text (agp)
August 7, 2007 56 REPLY declaration of Thomas M. McInerney in support of cost bill 55 filed by Bechtel Corporation. (McInerney, Thomas) Modified text on 8/8/2007 (tkl, ).
August 7, 2007 55 Objection to Bill of Costs re 53 Bill of Costs filed by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Marcus)
July 19, 2007 54 NOTICE: A Bill of Costs was filed by defendant Bechtel Corporation setting a hearing for August 9, 2007 at 2:00 pm. Any opposition to this Bill of Cost is to be filed by close of business on Tuesday, August 7, 2007. Parties requesting to appear telephonically for this hearing are to contact N. Prewitt (619) 557-6415. (nsp)
July 19, 2007 53 BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant Bechtel Corporation in the amount of $ 2,612.06. (McInerney, Thomas)
July 16, 2007 52 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Bechtel Corporation and DOES 1-100, inclusive against James Richard Stiefel. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 07/16/07. (agp)
July 13, 2007 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 07/13/07. (agp)
July 6, 2007 50 RESPONSE in Support re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Opposition and to Strike the Second Amended Complaint filed by Bechtel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Def. Bechtel Corp's Objections to Evidence Offered by Plaintiff in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and to Strike)(McInerney, Thomas)
July 2, 2007 49 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Request for Judicial Notice # 3 Exhibit # 4 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Marcus) Modified on 7/5/2007 to correct attorneys docket entry (agp).
June 15, 2007 48 Featured Case ORDER Re: Court's Intention to Decide defendants 45 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike filed by Bechtel Corporation without oral argument. The prior briefing schedule remains unchanged for both parties. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/15/2007. (jsp)
May 30, 2007 46 APPENDIX of State Authorities by Bechtel Corporation re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike (McInerney, Thomas) Modified on 5/31/2007 to correct attorneys docket text (agp
May 29, 2007 45 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike by Bechtel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of its Motion To Dismiss and To Strike The Second Amended Complaint)(McInerney, Thomas)
May 29, 2007 44 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Bechtel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(McInerney, Thomas) Modified on 5/29/2007 to indicate party refiled document correctly (see entry #45) (nsp). Modified on 5/31/2007 to correct attorneys docket text (agp).
May 14, 2007 43 Featured Case ORDER that the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for 07/09/2007 at 9:30 am is vacated. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 05/14/07. (agp)
May 10, 2007 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Marcus) Modified on 5/15/2007 to correct attorneys docket entry (agp).
April 10, 2007 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date this order is filed to file an amended complaint correcting the deficiencies of the claims dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/10/07. (bar, )
April 10, 2007 40 Featured Case ORDER: Attorney Jackson is ordered to contact the Court within 72 hours of the District Court's ruling re: Dft's motion requesting judicial notice to appise the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 04/10/07. (agp)
April 10, 2007 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William McCurine Jr.: Status Conference held on 4/10/2007. Court to issue order. (Plaintiff Attorney Marcus Jackson).(Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney). (jmj)
April 2, 2007 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION Judicial Notice Response-Opposition (Letter to Court requesting reply brief) filed by Bechtel Corporation. (McInerney, Thomas)
March 28, 2007 37 Response-Opposition to motion requesting judicial notice and motion to dismiss by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # Proof of Service (1))(Jackson, Marcus) Modified on 3/29/2007 to correct attorneys docket text (agp). Modified on 3/29/2007 to correct attorneys docket entry (agp).
March 22, 2007 36 Featured Case ORDER Submitting Motion to take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 03/22/07. (agp)
March 21, 2007 35 NOTICE by Bechtel Corporation 's Motion Requesting That The Court Take Judicial Notice That San Onofre Nuclear Generating Station Is Located On A Federal Enclave And To Dismiss Related Claims (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Its Motion Requesting That The Court Take Judicial Notice That San Onofre Nuclear Generating Station Is Located On A Federal Enclave And To Dismiss Related Claims# 2 Declaration of Thomas M. McInerney In Support of Def. Bechtel Corp.'s Motion Requesting That The Court Take Judicial Notice That San Onofre Nuclear Generating Station Is Located On A Federal Enclave And To Dismiss Related Claims)(McInerney, Thomas)
March 19, 2007 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities # 2 Declaration of Marcus Jackson # 3 Proof of Service) Modified on 3/20/2007 to correct attorneys docket entry (agp).
March 12, 2007 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bechtel Corporation re 32 Supplemental Document, (McInerney, Thomas)
March 9, 2007 32 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING in support of its motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Bechtel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas M. McInerney)(McInerney, Thomas) Modified on 3/12/2007 to correct attorneys docket text (agp).
March 5, 2007 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William McCurine Jr.: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/5/2007. Court has issued an order. (Tape #n/a).(Plaintiff Attorney Marcus Jackson).(Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney). (rab)
March 5, 2007 30 Featured Case ORDER that a telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/10/2007 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 03/05/07. (agp)
March 2, 2007 29 Featured Case ORDER that the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 06/11/07 at 9:30 AM is vacated and reset for 7/9/2007 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 03/02/07. (agp)
February 27, 2007 28 Featured Case ORDER Requesting Further Briefing. Dft shall submit a brief regarding his argument that the Court has jurisdiction to hear plnt's state claims on or before 03/12/07. Plnt shall submit any opposition on or before 03/19/07. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 02/26/07. (agp)
February 26, 2007 MINUTE ORDER submitting 22 Motion to Dismiss (tlm)
February 26, 2007 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff : Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2007 re 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bechtel Corporation - submitted. Deft's briefing due 3/12/07; pltf's resonse due 3/19/07. (Court Reporter ECR Nancy Cablay).(Plaintiff Attorney Marcus Jackson).(Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney). (tlm, )
February 16, 2007 26 REPLY re 25 MOTION to Dismiss , Opposition filed by Bechtel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(McInerney, Thomas)
February 12, 2007 25 Opposition to defendants Motion to dismiss by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# 2 Declaration of Marcus Jackson# 3 Proof of Service Proof of Service on 2-12-07)(Jackson, Marcus) Modified on 2/13/2007 to correct attorneys docket entry (agp).
January 12, 2007 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William McCurine Jr.: Status Conference held on 1/12/2007. Court to issue order for further status conference. (Tape #n/a).(Plaintiff Attorney Ann Guleser).(Defendant Attorney Deborah Schwartz). (rab)
January 12, 2007 23 Featured Case ORDER that a telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/5/2007 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 01/12/07. (agp)
January 11, 2007 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Bechtel Corporation. Responses due by 2/12/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)# 2 Declaration of Knut Larssen In Support of Defendant Bechtel Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6))(McInerney, Thomas)
December 27, 2006 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against all defendants, filed by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Marcus)
December 13, 2006 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/13/06. (agp)
December 11, 2006 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William McCurine Jr.: Status Conference held on 12/11/2006. Court to issue further order (Plaintiff Attorney Marcus Jackson).(Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney). (rab)
December 11, 2006 18 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 16 Notice of Change of Address, 17 Non Opposition to Motion (agp)
December 11, 2006 17 Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition re 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Bechtel Corporation. (agp)
December 11, 2006 16 NOTICE of Law Firm Name Change by attorney Thomas M McInerney. Copy of Notice given to attorney admissions. (agp)
December 11, 2006 15 Featured Case ORDER that a telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2007 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 12/11/06. (agp)
December 8, 2006 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (tlm)
November 28, 2006 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by James Richard Stiefel. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities # 3 Declaration # 4 Proposed Order# 5 Proof of Service)(Jackson, Marcus)
October 25, 2006 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William McCurine Jr.: Case Management Conference held on 10/25/2006; Court to issue order (Tape #n/a).(Plaintiff Attorney Marcus Jackson, James and Rachel Stiefel).(Defendant Attorney Thomas McInerney and Charles McCarthy). (rab)
October 25, 2006 11 Featured Case Case Management ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. A telephonic Status Conference set for 12/11/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 10/25/06. (r1r )
October 12, 2006 10 Joint Discovery Plan Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the FRCP. (duplicate document, refer to document # 9). (r1r, )
October 11, 2006 9 NOTICE of joint discovery plan pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Bechtel Corporation (tkl, )
September 1, 2006 8 Featured Case ORDER re Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.Signed by Judge William McCurine Jr. on 8/31/06. ENE Conf was held on 8/30/06.(r1r)
August 11, 2006 7 Notice and Order by Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.: E.N.E. Conference held on 3:30 8/30/06 before Mag Judge William McCurine Jr. (r1r)
July 31, 2006 6 Report of Clerk and Order of Transfer pursuant to Low Number Rule. Case transferred to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and referred to Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. (r1r)
July 20, 2006 5 Renewal of Demand for jury trial previously demanded in state court by plaintiff James Richard Stiefel (axr)
July 17, 2006 2 Notice of Party with Financial Interest by Bechtel Corporation (axr)
July 14, 2006 3 Proof of service by defendant Bechtel Corporation of: notice of party with financial interest and other accompanying documents (axr)
July 13, 2006 4 Notice by defendant Bechtel Corporation of related case(s) 06cv1413H(WMc) (low number order prepared) (axr)
July 13, 2006 1 Notice of Removal from Superior Court Court Case Number: GIN053461 ( to Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes ) Receipt No/Amt of Fee: #127100-A3, $350.00 (axr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiefel v. Bechtel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?