Janoe v. Stone, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01511
Filed: September 11, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 189 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/9/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
August 3, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/3/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
January 19, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Plaintiff's ex parte application for court order to Produce missing pages from deposition and granting 92 plaintiff's ex parte application for continuance of time to file opposition to dft's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/19/2010, Replies due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
February 9, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/9/09. The court adopts the R&R's analysis and recommendations as modified 60 and 65 . In sum, Defendant's motion to dismiss the SAC is granted, with prejudice and without leave to amend, as to Plaintiff's Claim One and Claim Five and is denied as to Plaintiff's Claim Four. With this disposition, Defendant shall file and serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Claims Two, Three, and Four within ten days of entry of this order. FRCP 12(a)(4)(A).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janoe v. Stone, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?