Marketing Info v. Board of Trustees, et al Featured Case

Read more at the Stanford Copyright and Fair Use, Fairly Used blog.

Plaintiff: Marketing Information Masters, Inc.
Defendant: - Board of Trustees of the California State University System. and Robert A Rauch
Case Number: 3:2006cv01682
Filed: August 18, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Dismissing action with prejudice based upon joint motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/18/09. (jpp) (jrl).
March 18, 2009 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP41 by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Lewis, Daniel) (jpp).
March 2, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C DeCarlo on behalf of - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch (DeCarlo, Daniel) (jpp).
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER setting Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference for 4/13/09 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 02/11/09. (jpp)
February 12, 2009 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/12/2009. Court will issue Order setting Settlement Disposition Conference. (Plaintiff Attorney Gregory Goonan).(Defendant Attorney Daniel DeCarlo). (ale)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE and ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation for 2/12/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 12/24/08. (jpp)
December 23, 2008 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint Answer by Defendant Robert A. Rauch to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Robert A Rauch.(Sirias, Deborah) (jpp).
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion for Sanctions. Defendant Board of Trustees is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/02/08. (jpp)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER vacating hearing date on 20 and 22 Defendants' motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions set for 06/09/08. Motions are taken under submission. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/03/08. (jpp)
May 20, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch re 30 Reply to Response to Motion, (Pink, Jonathan) (jpp).
May 20, 2008 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch re 31 Reply to Response to Motion, (Pink, Jonathan) (jpp).
May 16, 2008 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan) Modified on 5/19/2008 - email sent re signature and instructing to file proof (mjj)
May 16, 2008 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 of FRCP; Declaration Jonathan Pink filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan) Modified on 5/19/2008 - email sent re signature and instructing to file proof (mjj)
May 5, 2008 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 of FRCP; Declaration Jonathan Pink filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory P. Goonan, # 2 Exhibit 1 February 26, 2008 Letter from Pink to Goonan, # 3 Exhibit 2 February 26, 2008 Letter from Goonan to Pink, # 4 Exhibit 3 March 5, 2008 Letter from Pink to Goonan)(Goonan, Gregory) (jpp).
May 5, 2008 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory P. Goonan, # 2 Exhibit 1 February 26, 2008 Letter from Pink to Goonan, # 3 Exhibit 2 February 26, 2008 Letter from Goonan to Pink, # 4 Exhibit 3 March 5, 2008 Letter from Pink to Goonan)(Goonan, Gregory) (jpp).
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to continue the hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions. The hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss and motion for sanctions set for 05/05/08 is vacated and continued to 06/09/08 at 2:30pm. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 04/29/08. (jpp)
April 29, 2008 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Rule 11 Motion filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan) (jpp).
April 28, 2008 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Rule 11 Motion by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Goonan, Gregory) (jpp).
April 28, 2008 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan) (jpp).
April 28, 2008 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 of the FRCP; Declaration Jonathan Pink filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System.. (Pink, Jonathan) (jpp).
March 21, 2008 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 of FRCP; Declaration Jonathan Pink by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan), (jpp).
March 21, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 of the FRCP; Declaration Jonathan Pink by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan) Modified on 3/24/2008 to terminate, amended motion filed, refiled as 22 (jpp, )
March 13, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Pink, Jonathan) (jpp, ).
February 25, 2008 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants, filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc..(Goonan, Gregory) (jpp, ).
February 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/05/08. (jpp)
April 16, 2007 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jan M. Adler: After consideration, Plaintiff's Request for an early Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and/or Status Conference is DENIED. (hh)
March 30, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION ENE Conference or Status Conference by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Goonan, Gregory)
January 16, 2007 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston : The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss [doc. No. 12] set for January 18, 2007 is taken off calendar without oral argument. Court to prepare order. Parties notified by telephone. (Court Reporter N/A). (lwm, )
January 10, 2007 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintff's Exhibit A in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit Plaintff's Exhibit B in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# 3 Exhibit Plaintff's Exhibit C (Part 1) in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss# 4 Exhibit Plaintff's Exhibit C (Part 2) in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Goonan, Gregory)
November 20, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities # 2 Declaration # 3 Declaration)(Pink, Jonathan)
November 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot, 5 Motion to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/16/06 is vacated. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/08/06. (jpp, )
November 9, 2006 Filing 10 REPLY re 9 Reply Declaration in Support of Reply to Motion to Strike filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan)
November 8, 2006 Filing 9 REPLY re 7 Response in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss filed by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch. (Pink, Jonathan)
November 8, 2006 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Goonan, Gregory)
November 2, 2006 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 in support of Plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss)(Goonan, Gregory)
September 20, 2006 Filing 6 NOTICE by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System., Robert A Rauch re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Joinder by Co-Defendant Robert A. Rauch in the Board of Trustees of the CSU's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6) (Pink, Jonathan)
September 14, 2006 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). by - Board of Trustees of the California State University System.. Responses due by 11/2/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(jpp, )
September 12, 2006 Filing 4 Proof of Service of summons and complaint, served on Board of Trustees of the California State University System on 08/28/06, filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (jpp, )
September 12, 2006 Filing 3 Proof of Service of summons and complaint, served on Robert A. Rauch on 08/28/06, filed by Marketing Information Masters, Inc.. (jpp, )
August 22, 2006 Filing 2 Summons issued (jpp)
August 18, 2006 Filing 1 Complaint Filed; (referred to Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler); Demand for Jury Trial; Receipt No/Amt of Fee: #128412/$350.00 (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marketing Info v. Board of Trustees, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketing Information Masters, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory P Goonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Board of Trustees of the California State University System.
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Pink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Rauch
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Pink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?