Ortiz v. Tilton

Petitioner: Marcos Antonio Ortiz
Respondent: James E Tilton and Edmund G. Brown
Case Number: 3:2006cv01752
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Overruling Petitioner's Objections; Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Directing Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/16/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj) (kaj). Modified on 6/25/2009 to correct signature date (mjj)
January 9, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Denying 18 Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance as Moot and Denying Leave to File and Amended Complaint: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the action proceed forward with the claims in the original petition and that the stay of the Courts previously issued Report and Recommendation 14 is lifted. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/9/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
September 8, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: This Court RECOMMENDS that Petitioners Motion for leave to file the Amended Petition be DENIED, that this action PROCEED FORWARD with the cl aims in the original Petition and that the stay on this Courts previous Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 14] be LIFTED. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2008, Any reply to the objections due no later than 10 days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/8/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcos Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E Tilton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?