Federal Trade Commission v. Neovi Inc et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01952
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2012 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 275 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing and Modify Briefing Schedule; and denying 276 Ex Parte Motion For Hearing to Demonstrate Compliance With Final Order. The motion hearing currently set for September 20, 2012 is HEREBY CONTINU ED to September 27, 2012. Further, the time for Defendants to file an opposition to Plaintiffs motion shall be extended to August 28, 2012, and Plaintiff shall have until September 4, 2012 to file a reply. Defendants SHALL FILE a Notice of Compliance by August 10, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. The FTC MAY JOIN in Defendants Notice of Compliance, or alternatively MAY FILE a response to the Notice by August 24, 2012 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2012. (mtb)
July 11, 2012 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Holding Defendants In Contempt of January 7, 2009 Final Order and Ordering Sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/11/2012.(mtb)
April 18, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) reserving ruling on 208 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dan M. Fisher; (2) granting 209 Motion to Exclude Third-Party Websites. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/18/11. (lmt) (jcj).
September 27, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 187 Defendants' Motion to Limit the Scope of the Show Cause Hearing: At the show cause hearing, Plaintiff may present its case as to why Defendants' marketing of VersaCheck violates the Final Order. No later than 10/18/10: ( 1) Defendants shall serve Plaintiff with a disclosure for their expert witness, Mr. Fisher, consistent with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2); and (2) The parties shall exchange lists of exhibits and witnesses to be offered at the show cause hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/27/10. (lmt)
September 10, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 191 Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute: Defendants shall serve a disclosure for Mr. Fisher, consistent with the requirements ofRule 26(a)(2), no later than 9/17/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 9/10/10. (lmt)
January 7, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' 107 Motion for Reconsideration; Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 116 Motion to Strike; and Granting Plaintiff's Proposed Injunctive Relief: The Court shall separately enter an injunction against Defendants. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/7/09. (pdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Neovi Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?