Antoninetti et al v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02671
Filed: December 6, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 183 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment as to fees, costs, and expenses totaling $337,752.27. (This award includes $317,927.50 in attorneys' fees and $19,824.77 in costs.) As no issues remain, the Clerk of Court shall close the docket of this case. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9-29-2014. (cjb)
March 28, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable David H. Bartick, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magist rate Judge Bartick, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 06cv2671 BTM (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 03/28/14.(jcj)
January 14, 2013 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 146 Motion for Reconsideration and Granting in Part Motion for Clarification. The Court Denies Defendant's request that the Court issue an order to show cause why Plaintiffs should not be sanctioned. The trial in this case shall commence on July 8, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/14/2013. (rlu)
August 28, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 88 Motion to Certify Class, Appointment of Class Representatives and Appointment of Class Counsel. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to re-file a motion for class certification if, upon further discovery, Plaintiffs can establish that their claims for injunctive relief and corresponding declaratory relief are not moot. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/28/2012. (rlu)
May 26, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Substitute Party. Jay Rifkin's motion to be substituted as Plaintiff in this matter in place of his deceased father, Michael Rifkind, is granted. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/26/2011. (jer)
May 23, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Chipotle's Motion to Compel 20 Depositions of Putative Class Members. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/23/2011.(jer)
May 16, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 65 Motion to Strike. Defendant's motion to strike portions of the First Amended Complaint that reference a Ninth Circuit opinion in a related case, Antoninetti v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., 614 F.3d 971 (9th Cir. 2010), is denied. The Court finds that language referencing the Ninth Circuit opinion in Antoninetti is not "immaterial" or otherwise improper. The parties may address the issue of preclusion in a motion for summary judgment after the motion for class certification is decided. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/16/2011. (jer)
April 21, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Chipotle's Motion to Compel Further Answers to Request for Production No. 12. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/21/11.(jer)
March 17, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/17/2011.(jer)
October 27, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Reimpose Stay. The stay shall remain lifted and discovery shall be conducted such that there is no duplication of effort on issues to be determined on remand in the related single-plaintiff case. The Magistrate Judge shall schedule a telephonic status conference. The Parties may discuss their discovery plans at that time. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/27/2010. (jer)
October 30, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Stay; Case is stayed until final resolution of the related case, Antoninetti v. Chipotle, Case No. 3:05CV1660-J-WMC. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 10/30/09. (ksr) (jrl).
October 26, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following telephonic ENE conference held 10/23/09. If the parties desire to continue to stay discovery in this case an application to Judge Jones must be made on or before October 28, 2009. ( Telephonic Status Hearing set for 11/13/2009 04:45 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.) Defense counsel is instructed to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/26/09. (bjb) (jrl).
April 27, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following telephonic status conference. Counsel for defendants is instructed to initiate the call.( Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 04/26/09. (bjb) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoninetti et al v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?