Rodriguez et al v. United States of America et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv02753
Filed: December 20, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 151 ) Joint Motion to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/2/2010. (cap)
February 3, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying (Doc. 132 ) Motion for New Trial and (2) Denying (Doc. 134 ) Motion for Relief from Failure to File Documents. The Court Orders the parties to attend a Pretrial Conference on March 15, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/3/2010. (cap) (jrl).
November 6, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's May 15, 2009 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/6/2009. (cap) (jrl).
January 5, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Telephonic Discovery/Case Management Conference. The Telephonic Discovery/Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. A Telephonic Discovery/Case Management Conference is hereby set for 1/9/2009 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. The letter brief submitted by Plaintiffs violates the Court's 12/19/08 Order and is hereby stricken. Plaintiffs shall resubmit a letter brief which conforms with the Court's Order by no later that the close of business on 1/6/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 1/5/09. (cap) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?