Ravet v. Solomon, Ward, Seidenwurm & Smith et al

Plaintiff: Gary K Ravet
Defendant: Solomon, Ward, Seidenwurm & Smith, Ashworth, Blanchet, Christenson, & Kalemkirian, LLC, Paul Metsch, Edward McIntyre, Lesa Christenson, Marc O Stern, Meryl Zinn, Does 1 through 100 and Joel Wohlfeil
Case Number: 3:2007cv00031
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/22/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 6, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 189 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees: this Court grants Defendant's motion for attorneys' fees in the amount of $14,075. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 14, 2007 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint motion re extension of time for dft Lesa Christenson to respond to pla's first amended complaint 65. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/9/07. (tkl)
July 17, 2007 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motions to dismiss, denying motions to strike as moot and dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/17/07. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravet v. Solomon, Ward, Seidenwurm & Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary K Ravet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon, Ward, Seidenwurm & Smith
Represented By: Edward J McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashworth, Blanchet, Christenson, & Kalemkirian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesa Christenson
Represented By: Andrew Servais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc O Stern
Represented By: Marc O Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meryl Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Wohlfeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?