Norwood v. Woodford et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Norwood
Defendant: A J Janda, R Torres, Jeanne Woodford, M E Bourland, J A Giurbino and Rutledge, -
Case Number: 3:2007cv00057
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion for extension of time pursuant to FRAP 4(a)(6) re 127 Notice of Appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall immediately provide a copy of this order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/24/2010. (USCA Case No. 09-56969. Order transmitted electronically to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
November 16, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Order To Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed As To Defendant Torres For Failure To Prosecute Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) (Re Doc. 120 ): Because Plaintiff has failed to properly serve Defendant Torres, the Court dismisses the action against Defendant Torres for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). The Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (av1).
September 5, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 69 ) is adopted. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jeanne Woodford and Gerald Janda (Doc. 33 ); the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jeanne Woodford, Gerald Janda and M Bourland (Doc. 44 ); and the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jeanne Woodford, Gerald Janda, M Bourland, and J Giurbino (Doc. 58 ) are denied. All claims against Sergeant Rutledge are dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/5/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
May 1, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service of First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(2) And 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(d): (1) The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the First Amended Complaint and summons upon Defendants a s directed by Plaintiff on U.S. Marshal Form 285. (2) Defendants are thereafter ORDERED to reply to the First Amended Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). (3) Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendants or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Defendants' counsel, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration of the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper to be filed wit h the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the manner in which a true and correct copy of any document was served on Defendants, or counsel for Defendants, and the date of service. Any paper received by the Court which has not been filed with the Clerk or which fails to include a Certificate of Service will be disregarded. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/1/07. (mdc) (bar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A J Janda
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Torres
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M E Bourland
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Giurbino
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutledge, -
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?