Mercexchange, L.L.C. v. eBay Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mercexchange, L.L.C.
Defendant: eBay Inc. and Half.com, Inc.
Miscellaneous Party: Fish & Richardson P.C.
ThirdParty Defendant: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00231
Filed: February 2, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2007 19
CLERK'S JUDGMENT; Defendant's motion to compel is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to quash subpoena duces tecum is denied without prejudice . (jpp, )
February 20, 2007 18
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Gregory N Stillman appearing for Plaintiff Mercexchange, L.L.C. (jah)
February 16, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Defendants Ebay Inc.'s and Half.com's Motion to Compel Fish & Richardson P.C. to comply with a subpoena duces tecum and, denying without prejudice 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash subpoena duces tecum upon Fish & Richardson. Signed by Judge Louisa S Porter on 02/16/07. (jpp, )
February 14, 2007 16
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by eBay Inc., Half.com, Inc. re 14 Declaration,, 13 Reply,, 15 Response in Opposition to Motion (Randall, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2007 15
RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Upon Fish & Richardson P.C. filed by eBay Inc., Half.com, Inc.. (Randall, Jeffrey). Modified on 2/14/2007 - Missing Proof of Service. Atty contacted (jah).
February 9, 2007 9
PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff MercExchange, LLC's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Upon Fish & Richardson P.C. and Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel by Mercexchange, L.L.C.. (Mortimer, Ann Marie). Modified on 2/12/2007 - Incorrect Event used, not a Motion. Proposed Orders are not to be filed per ECF Policies and Procedures. Corrected text. Motion termed. Atty contacted (jah).
February 6, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting Dfts' 3 Motion to Shorten Time for Breifing and a Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/6/2007. Any opposition to Dfts' motion to compel Fish & Richardson to comply w/ subpoena duces tecum shall be filed by 2/9/2007. Any reply shall be filed by 2/13/2007. Motion scheduled for 2/15/2007 at 2:00pm. No oral argument shall be heard. Motion shall be decided on the papers(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercexchange, L.L.C. v. eBay Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercexchange, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Represented By: David Peyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half.com, Inc.
Represented By: David Peyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous party: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Schmied
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?