Latham & Watkins LLP v. United States Environmental Protection Agency Featured Case

Plaintiff: Latham & Watkins LLP
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2007cv00245
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2007 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 06/06/07. (jcj)
June 4, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER. The 06/12/07 Settlement Disposition Conference is Vacated. Dismissal received. Signed by Judge Leo S. Papas on 06/04/07. (jcj)
May 29, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER. The Court is informed by Plaintiff's counsel that, due to evidentiary rulings made by the District Court Judge assigned to this case, this case is now moot and will be dismissed. The 05/29/07 ENE is Vacated. Signed by Judge Leo S. Papas on 05/29/07. (jcj)
April 24, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
Notice and ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, set for 5/29/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas. Signed by Judge Leo S. Papas on 04/24/07. (jcj)
March 12, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 8 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Responsive Pleading. United States Environmental Protection Agency answer due 4/23/2007. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 03/09/07. (jxj)
March 9, 2007 8
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or to File Responsive Pleading by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Callan, Megan)
February 7, 2007 3
Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jxj)
February 6, 2007 2
Disclosure Statement by Latham & Watkins LLP. (jxj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latham & Watkins LLP v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latham & Watkins LLP
Represented By: Robert M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Megan Callan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?