American Tower Corporation v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: American Tower Corporation
Defendant: City of San Diego, City Council of the City of San Diego and Development Services Department of the City of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2007cv00399
Filed: March 2, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2015 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part ATC's 382 Motion to Retax Costs. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/10/2015. (knb)
May 24, 2012 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Parties' Respective Motions to Re-Tax Costs (Doc. Nos. 346 , 347 , 348 , 321 ). The Court orders that the clerk's taxation of costs be re-taxed such that the costs are not taxed against either party. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/24/2012. (knb)
September 16, 2011 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying the City's 299 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's August 5, 2011 and August 26, 2011 Orders are clarified with regard to the proper remedy for the PSA violation and the § 253 claim. The September 19, 2011 hearing date is vacated. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/16/2011. (knb)
August 29, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting the City's Successive 276 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/27/2011. (knb)
August 26, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 234 ATC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 235 the City's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/26/11. (ecs)
August 5, 2011 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part ATC's Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part the City's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. Nos. 128 , 129 , 130 ). Additionally, ATC having filed redacted versions of the Leslie Vartanian, Aaron Feduk, and William Tifft declarations on the public docket and pursuant to the protective order issued in this case, ATCs motion to file the unredacted versions of the above declarations under seal is granted.Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/5/2011. (knh)(jrd)
April 4, 2011 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Dates and Suspending Discovery; Order Setting Settlement Conference: On March 25, 2011, the Court conducted a Status Conference. Settlement Conference set for 6/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/4/2011.(knh)
November 8, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 152 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/5/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Tower Corporation v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tower Corporation
Represented By: Robert Jystad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Represented By: Christine M Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of the City of San Diego
Represented By: Christine M Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Development Services Department of the City of San Diego
Represented By: Christine M Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?