Pacific Law Center et al v. Saadat-Nejad Featured Case

Plaintiffs Pacific Law Center and Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith, LLP alleged that Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, a former client, engaged in trademark infringement, cybersquatting and unfair competition by registering and using domain names confusingly similar to those of the Plaintiffs to disparage them.

Plaintiff: Pacific Law Center and Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP
Defendant: Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad
Amicus: San Diego ACLU
Case Number: 3:2007cv00460
Filed: March 13, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2008 89 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED *The Court grants summary judgment in favor of the Defendant and dismisses all of Plaintiffs' claims* (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)
September 2, 2008 88 Featured Case ORDER Granting Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendant and Dismissing all of Plaintiffs' Claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 09/02/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)
August 18, 2008 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re 78 Order to Show Cause, filed by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (McIntyre, Edward) (mkz).
August 15, 2008 86 Response to 80 Brief re Order to Show Cause filed by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (mkz)
August 14, 2008 85 Response in Opposition re 82 Declaration, filed by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (McIntyre, Edward) Modified on 8/19/2008 to link to proper doc (mkz).
August 11, 2008 84 MOTION for Extension of 6/16/08 Court Order Directing Parties to Show Cause by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. NUNC PRO TUNC 8/7/08 (mkz)
August 11, 2008 83 Discrepancy Order by Judge Janis L. Sammartino accepting document: Motion for Extension of Time from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. Signed by chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 08/07/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)
August 1, 2008 82 DECLARATION by Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/25/08 (mkz)
August 1, 2008 81 Notice of Document Discrepancy and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Declaration from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Supplemental documents require court order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)
July 25, 2008 80 BRIEF Addressing Issues This Court's Order Raised Directing Parties to Show Cause Why Summary Judgment Should Not Be Entered by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre, # 2 Declaration of Michael M. Vasseghi, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits)(McIntyre, Edward) Modified on 7/28/2008 to term motion, correct event (mkz).
June 16, 2008 78 Featured Case ORDER Directing Parties to Show Cause as to Why Summary Judgment Should not Entered: The Court held a pre-trial conference on 6/12/08. If the parties cannot resolve this dispute prior to 7/25/08, the parties shall submit their briefs in accordance with this Order. Plaintiffs shall file their brief by 7/25/2008. Defendant shall file his response by 8/15/08. Plaintiffs may file a reply by 8/27/08. Judge Burns' preliminary injunction order remains in effect until the Court rules otherwise. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 06/16/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)
June 12, 2008 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Pretrial Conference held on 6/12/2008 (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Robert F. Clark & Edward McIntyre / Defendant Pro Se Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad)(acr)
May 28, 2008 77 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Pacific Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit list, # 2 Exhibit Witness list)(Clarke, Robert) (mkz).
May 28, 2008 76 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Solomon Ward's Exhibit List, # 2 Solomon Ward's Witness List)(McIntyre, Edward) Modified on 5/29/2008, atty contacted re s/ (mkz).
May 21, 2008 75 NOTICE of Pre-Trial Disclosures by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad (mkz)
May 19, 2008 74 NOTICE Pacific Law Center's Pre- Trial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) (Clarke, Robert) (mkz).
May 19, 2008 73 NOTICE Solomon Ward's Pre-Trial Disclosures [Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3)] (McIntyre, Edward) (mkz).
May 14, 2008 72 Minute Entry : On Court's own motion, Final Pretrial Conference reset from 6/9/08 to 6/12/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (df/acr)
May 5, 2008 71 REPLY re 67 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (mkz) Modified on 5/6/2008 to indicate: NUNC PRO TUNC 4/30/08 (mkz).
May 5, 2008 70 Discrepancy Order by Judge Janis L. Sammartino accepting document: Reply from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule Other: No Provision for reply. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 05/05/08. (mkz)
April 25, 2008 69 DECLARATION re 68 Notice, 67 Response to Order to Show Cause Proof of Service by Plaintiff Pacific Law Center. (Clarke, Robert) (mkz).
April 25, 2008 68 NOTICE by Pacific Law Center re 67 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Request for Dismissal, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 4 Exhibit Attachment 3, # 5 Exhibit Attachment 4, # 6 Exhibit Attachment 4, # 7 Exhibit Attachment 6, # 8 Exhibit Attachment 7, # 9 Exhibit Attachment 8, # 10 Memo of Points and Authorities Attachment 9, # 11 Exhibit Attachment 10, # 12 Exhibit Attachment 11, # 13 Exhibit Attachment 12, # 14 Exhibit Attachment 13, # 15 Exhibit Attachment 14, # 16 Exhibit Attachment 15, # 17 Exhibit Attachment 16, # 18 Exhibit Attachment 18, # 19 Exhibit Attachment 18, # 20 Exhibit Attachment 19, # 21 Exhibit Attachment 20, # 22 Exhibit Attachment 21, # 23 Exhibit Attachment 22, # 24 Exhibit Attachment 23, # 25 Exhibit Attachment 24, # 26 Exhibit Attachment 25, # 27 Exhibit Attachment 26, # 28 Exhibit Attachment 27, # 29 Exhibit Attachment 28, # 30 Exhibit Attachment 29, # 31 Exhibit Attachment 30, # 32 Exhibit Attachment 31, # 33 Exhibit Attachment 32, # 34 Exhibit Attachment 33, # 35 Exhibit Attachment 34, # 36 Exhibit Attachment 35, # 37 Exhibit Attachment 36, # 38 Exhibit Attachment 37, # 39 Exhibit Attachment 38, # 40 Exhibit Attachment 39, # 41 Exhibit Attachment 40, # 42 Exhibit Attachment 41, # 43 Exhibit Attachment 42, # 44 Exhibit Attachment 43, # 45 Exhibit Attachment 44, # 46 Exhibit Attachment 45, # 47 Exhibit Attachment 46, # 48 Exhibit Attachment 48, # 49 Exhibit Attachment 49, # 50 Exhibit Attachment 50, # 51 Exhibit Attachment 51, # 52 Declaration Declaration of Tatiana Ganuza)(Clarke, Robert) (mkz).
April 25, 2008 67 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Pacific Law Center. (Clarke, Robert) (mkz).
April 24, 2008 66 REPLY re 61 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney,Order Why This Court Should Not Abstain and Stay These Proceedings filed by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits)(McIntyre, Edward) (mkz).
April 9, 2008 65 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendant's 64 Motion for "Writ of Mandamus": Defendant requests that the Court: (1) order Plaintiffs to provide him a copy of his 8/3/06 retainer with Pacific Law Center, and (2) send the federal "court file" to Judge Richard Strauss who is presider over the parallel state court case against Defendant. The Court denies Defendant's first request as premature because he has failed to show that Plaintiffs have failed to comply with any particular discovery request under Rule 34 of the FRCP. The Court also denies Defendant's second request because there is no legal basis for it. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 04/09/08. (mkz)
April 8, 2008 64 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of Motion) NUNC PRO TUNC 3/27/08(mkz)
April 8, 2008 63 Discrepancy Order by Judge Janis L. Sammartino accepting document: Writ of Mandamus from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule Other: Supplemental Documents require Court Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 04/08/08. (mkz)
March 24, 2008 61 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 55 Motion for Permanent Injunction Without Prejudice; Requesting Plaintiffs to Show Cause as to Why this Court Should not Abstain and Stay these Proceedings due to Parallel State Court Proceedings; and Granting Plaintiffs' 59 Motion to Substitution of Attorney: Plaintiff shall file a response to this Order by 4/25/08. Added attorney Robert F Clarke for Pacific Law Center, Attorney Edward J McIntyre terminated as counsel for Pacific Law Center. The Court vacates the 3/28/08 hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a permanent injunction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 03/24/08. (mkz) (av1, ).
March 21, 2008 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (McIntyre, Edward) (mkz). (mkz).
March 17, 2008 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louisa S Porter : Settlement Conference held on 3/17/2008.(Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (rfm)
March 17, 2008 59 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pacific Law Center. (Spears, Alan) Modified on 3/19/2008, atty contacted re proposed order (mkz). (mkz).
March 13, 2008 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. NUNC PRO TUNC 3/13/08 (mkz)
March 13, 2008 57 Discrepancy Order by Judge Janis L. Sammartino accepting document: Response and Opposition from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule 7.1: Missing Table of Contents and Other: No Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 03/13/08. (mkz) (av1, ).
March 6, 2008 56 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: A Settlement Conference will be held on 3/17/2008 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom H before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Signed by Judge Louisa S Porter on 03/06/08. (mkz) (av1, ).
November 15, 2007 55 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Pacific Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Permanent Injunction# 2 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre in Support of Permanent Injunction)(McIntyre, Edward)
October 2, 2007 54 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Janis Sammartino for all further proceedings. Case No. 07CV0460-JLS(POR). Judge Larry Alan Burns no longer assigned to caseFinal Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2008 10:45 AM in Courtroom 6 before Janis Sammartino. (nsp)
September 4, 2007 53 Featured Case Case Management ORDER regulating Discovery and other Pretrial proceedings: On 8/29/07, the Court held a Case Management Conference. All Discovery shall be completed on or before 1/4/08. All motions shall be filed on or before 2/4/08. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before 6/2/08. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/9/2008 10:45 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. The Proposed final pretrial conference order is to be served and lodged with the Clerk's Office on or before 6/2/08. Signed by Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/4/07. (vrp) Modified on 9/5/2007 to correct hearing date (vrp)(bar ).
August 29, 2007 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louisa S Porter : Case Management Conference held on 8/29/2007. Rule 16 dates issued. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (rfm)
July 27, 2007 51 Featured Case ORDER following status hearing of 7/25/07, purging civil contempt, and setting case management conference. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom H before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/25/07. (vrp)(bar ).
July 25, 2007 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns : Status Conference held on 7/25/2007. Court orders the dft released from custody. Abstract to USM. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter EVA OEMICK).(Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre) (Attorney: John David Blair-Loy).(Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (tlw)
July 25, 2007 49 Abstract of Order. Defendant be released from custody. (jcj)
July 24, 2007 48 DECLARATION of Edward J. McIntyre by Plaintiff Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
July 24, 2007 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns: The American Civil Liberties Union of San Diego & Imperial Counties has applied to the Court for leave to file a brief in amicus curiae associated with civil contempt proceedings in this matter. The 46 Application is Granted, and the brief is accepted for filing and consideration at the 07/25/07 hearing. (jcj)
July 23, 2007 46 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John David Blair-Loy on behalf of San Diego ACLU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE ACLU OF SAN DIEGO & IMPERIAL COUNTIES)(Blair-Loy, John)
July 17, 2007 45 TRANSCRIPT of Motion/Miscellaneous Hearing held on 04/26/2007 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Court Reporter: Frank J. Rangus. (mkz)
July 16, 2007 43 Featured Case ORDER following hearing on Order to Show Cause re Contempt, granting 39 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/13/07. Saadat-Nejad shall remain in custody until the next scheduled hearing in this matter, set for 7/25/07 at 12:15PM before Judge Larry A. Burns. (vrp)(bar ).
July 12, 2007 44 ABSTRACT OF ORDER remanding defendant for civil contempt. No Bail. Abstract issued to USM.(vrp)(bar ).
July 12, 2007 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns : Show Cause Hearing held on 7/12/2007. Motion for contempt re: court's 4/26/07 preliminary injunction - granted. Court finds the dft in civil contempt of the preliminary injunction. Court orders the dft remanded into custody. Court orders dft detained without bail. Abstract to USM.Further Status Conference set for 7/25/2007 12:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns.(Court Reporter EVA OEMICK).(Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre and Thomas Slattery).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (tlw)
July 9, 2007 40 REPLY re 39 MOTION for Contempt re This Court's April 26, 2007 Preliminary Injunction filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)(mam).
July 6, 2007 41 REPLY re 37 Order to Show Cause, filed by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (vrp)(mam).
June 20, 2007 39 MOTION for Contempt re This Court's April 26, 2007 Preliminary Injunction by Pacific Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre in Support of Order to Show Cause re Contempt# 2 Exhibit Notice of Lodmgent of Exhibits)(McIntyre, Edward)
June 19, 2007 38 AFFIDAVIT re 37 Order to Show Cause, Terminate Motions, Set Hearings,,, Affidavit of Service of Order and Ex Parte Papers by Plaintiff Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
June 19, 2007 37 Featured Case Order Granting 36 Ex Parte Application and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant Shahrok Saadat-Nejad should not be held in contempt of this Court's 04/26/07 Preliminary Injunction Order. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/12/2007 12:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Plaintiff shall file their papers in support by 06/20/07.Saadat-Nejad may file responsive papers by 7/6/2007. Plaintiffs may file a reply by 7/9/2007. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 06/19/07. (jcj)
June 19, 2007 36 Ex Parte MOTION for Contempt for Order to Show Cause Concerning Saadat-Nejad's Contempt by Pacific Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre in Support of OSC re Contempt)(McIntyre, Edward)
June 11, 2007 35 NOTICE (filed as an answer) t/w Declaration of Service by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad (jpp, )
May 29, 2007 34 REQUEST (filed as an answer) by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad for relief from default. NUNC PRO TUNC 05/21/07.(jpp, )
May 29, 2007 33 Discrepancy Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns accepting document: Construed as: request for relief from default from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule other: Clerk's Default Entered. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 05/24/07. (jpp, )
May 25, 2007 32 Featured Case ORDER construing filing and granting Defendant's request for relief from Default. Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad answer due 6/11/2007.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 05/25/07. (jpp, )
May 15, 2007 31 Discrepancy Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns rejecting document: Response & Oppose Default & Motion from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule 5.1; other: no indication of ex parte request for relief from default or showing why dft is purportedly not in default; the exhibits are irrelevant to the default issue; argument regarding detail or merits of other cases is irrelevant to the default issue in this case; extraneous argument fails to show good cause for relief from the default; no motion to dismiss hearing was requested and none will be granted while defendant remains in default; the document is rejected, the clerk is ordered to strike the document from the record; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/15/07. (kaj)
May 14, 2007 30 Document stricken from the record per discrepancy order by Judge Burns on 5/15/07 31 (kaj) Modified on 5/16/2007 to strike document (kaj).
May 9, 2007 29 SET ASIDE PER ORDER 32 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad (kaj) Modified on 5/29/2007 to reflect default is set aside (jpp, ).
May 8, 2007 28 Request for Entry of Clerks Default against Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre# 2 [Proposed] Default by Clerk)(McIntyre, Edward)
April 30, 2007 27 Declaration of Service on Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad re 26 by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward) Modified on 5/1/2007 to correct text (kaj).
April 27, 2007 26 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; plaintiffs' counsel shall ensure service of this Order on Saadat-Nejad, and all other court documents, in the manner the parties have agreed on the record; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/27/07. (kaj)
April 27, 2007 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2007. 18 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pacific Law Center held. Court to issued order.(Court Reporter Frank Rangus).(Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadt-Nejad). (tlw)
April 25, 2007 24 RESPONSE re 18 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad (nunc pro tunc 4/23/07) (kaj)
April 25, 2007 23 Discrepancy Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns accepting document: response to pla's falsified and manufactured documents from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule 7.1 or 47.1; other: missing proof of service; filing authorized by docket #15, dft to forthwith serve and file proof of service; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/23/07. (kaj)
April 18, 2007 22 RESPONSE in Support re 18 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Errata to Supplemental Memorandum filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
April 17, 2007 21 Featured Case ORDER; telephonic settlement conf held on 4/16/07; Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/26/2007 12:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns; Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 4/17/07. (kaj)
April 16, 2007 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louisa S Porter : Settlement Conference held on 4/16/2007. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (rfm, )
April 16, 2007 18 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
April 11, 2007 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louisa S Porter : Settlement Conference held on 4/11/2007. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Edward McIntyre).(Defendant Attorney Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad). (rfm, )
April 11, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER; settlement conf held on 4/11/07; Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom H before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 4/11/07. (kaj)
April 3, 2007 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Following Hearing on Plaintiffs' Application for a TRO Pacific Law Center and Solomon Ward served on Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad on April 3, 2007, filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
April 2, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER; the court granted the application for temporary restraining order and separately enters the TRO; Magistrate Judge Porter set a settlement conference for Wednesday, April 11, 2007 at 10:00am in Courtroom H; no later than noon on April 9, 2007, the parties shall lodge in Magistrate Judge Porter's chambers their Confidential Settlement Briefs; Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Thursday, April 26, 2007 at noon before Judge Larry A. Burns; plas supporting brief due on or before April 16, 2007; dft's reply/opposition due no later than April 23, 2007 at 5:00pm . Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/29/07. (kaj)
March 29, 2007 14 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 03/29/07. (joeh, )
March 29, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER, granting 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Solomon Ward and filed by Pacific Law Center,. Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom H before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/26/2007 12:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 03/29/07. (joeh, )
March 29, 2007 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry Alan Burns : Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2007. Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 3 is granted in part and denied in part. Court to issue written order. Matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Porter for a settlement conference. Motion hearing on preliminary injunction, if applicable, shall be set for 4/26/07 at 12:00 pm; plaintiff's motion to be efiled by 4/16/07 before 5:00 pm; defendant's written opposition to be filed with the Clerk's Ofice by 4/23/07 before 5:00 pm (Court Reporter Eva Oemick / CRD: A. Ramos / Plaintiff Attorneys: Edward McIntryre & Christina Milligan / Pro Se Defendant: Shahrohk Saadat-Nejad) (acr)
March 29, 2007 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Pacific Law Center and Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith served on Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad on March 14, 2007, filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
March 28, 2007 10 DECLARATION of Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad and Response to All Ex Parte in All Court Cases Listed by Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. NUNC PRO TUNC 3/26/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part 2)(jah)
March 28, 2007 9 Discrepancy Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns accepting document: Declaration of Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad and response to all ex parte in all court cases listed from Defendant Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad, non-compliance with local rule. No proof of service. Dft to file Proof of Service forthwith. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/27/2007. (jah)
March 27, 2007 8 RESPONSE in Support re 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Solomon Ward and Pacific Law Center filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
March 23, 2007 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 6 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Declaration of Notice by Edward J McIntyre on behalf of all plaintiffs (McIntyre, Edward)
March 23, 2007 6 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order 3 ; dft shall serve and file a memorandum responsive to plas' application no later than Monday, March 26, 2007 at 4:00pm; plas shall serve and file a reply memorandum no later than Wednesday, March 28, 2007 at noon; TRO Hearing set for 3/29/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Larry Alan Burns; counsel for plas shall forthwith give dft telephonic notice of the contents of this Order and shall expeditiously effectuate service of same; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/23/07. (kaj)
March 22, 2007 5 Minute Entry: Judge M. James Lorenz recuses from this case and orders another judge assigned. Judge Larry Alan Burns randomly assigned. New case number 07cv0460-LAB(POR). (jsp)
March 22, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Ex Parte Application, et al. Edward J. McIntyre personally served on Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad on March 22, 2007, filed by Pacific Law Center. (McIntyre, Edward)
March 21, 2007 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Solomon Ward and by Pacific Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion# 2 Declaration of Thomas Slattery# 3 Declaration of Edward J. McIntyre)(McIntyre, Edward)
March 13, 2007 2 Summons Issued as to Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad. (rxm)
March 13, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad (Filing fee $ 350./#135996) , filed by Pacific Law Center, Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Letter) (Letter and copy of complaint mailed)(rxm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Law Center et al v. Saadat-Nejad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Law Center
Represented By: Edward J McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Ward Seidenwurm and Smith LLP
Represented By: Edward J McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahrokh Saadat-Nejad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Diego ACLU
Represented By: John David Blair-Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?