Stillwell et al v. Radioshack Corporation

Plaintiff: Futurelink Corp., Robert Stillwell, SDP Electronics, Inc. and Electronic Marketing Corp.
Defendant: Radioshack Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv00607
Filed: April 3, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 defendant's ex parte application for leave to use audio visual equipment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/4/2010; cc: USM. (tkl) (kaj).
February 5, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule and evidentiary hearing. On February 4, 2010, the Court held a telephonic conference. Hearing set for 3/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/5/2010.(tkl) (jrl).
November 2, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/2/09. (tkl) (jrl).
October 26, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 joint Motion to Extend the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff Date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/26/09. (tkl) (jrl).
September 29, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending 93 supplemental reports by damages experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/29/09. (tkl)(jrl).
September 2, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending discovery completion dates 83 . All other pre-trial dates and deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/2/09. (tkl) (jrl).
July 24, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Plaintiff's Motion for the protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 7/24/09. (tkl) (jrl).
May 11, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 joint Motion to Continue the deadline to file motions tocompel further responses to outstanding discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/11/09. (tkl) (jrl).
April 28, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 joint Motion to Continue Deadline to File Motions to Compel Further Responses to Outstanding Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/28/09. (tkl) (jrl).
March 27, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 re defendant's motion to compel further interrogatory responses. On March 25, 2009, the Court held a telephonic hearing on Defendants motion to compel further interrogatory responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/27/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 26, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 the parties' joint motion to continue all case management dates. On February 25, 2009, the Court held a telephonic conference. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/27/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Trial set for 1/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. A telephonic Status Conference set for 3/13/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E before Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/26/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 24, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 55 Substitution of Attorney. Added attorney Jones Day and Randy S. Grossman for Radioshack Corporation. Attorney Gary K Brucker, Jr and Ross H Hyslop terminated.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/24/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 10, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 without prejudice plaintiffs' Motion motion to compel production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/10/09. (tkl)
January 5, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 the joint Motion to extend the deadline on discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/5/09. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwell et al v. Radioshack Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Futurelink Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stillwell
Represented By: Jeffrey L Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SDP Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Marketing Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey L Fillerup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radioshack Corporation
Represented By: Ross H Hyslop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?