Swarberg v. Menu Foods Holding Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Diane Swarberg
Defendant: Menu Foods Holding Inc, The Iams Company and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv00706
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2007 35
Case transferred to District of New Jersey pursuant to MDL 1850. (bar)
July 2, 2007 34
NOTICE by Menu Foods Holding Inc re 30 Order on Motion to Stay NOTICE OF MULTIDISTRICT CONSOLIDATION PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407 AND REQUEST TO MAINTAIN STAY (Hack, Susan)
June 22, 2007 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 31 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading without prejudice without prejudice as moot.Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/22/07. (jpp)
June 11, 2007 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying [29} Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/08/07. (jpp, )
June 8, 2007 30 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 6 Defendant Menu Foods Holding Inc's Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 06/08/07. (jpp, )
June 1, 2007 28
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brian D Wright appearing for Defendant The Iams Company (jpp, )
May 23, 2007 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant The Iams Company First Responsive pleading is due on or before 6/11/2007 . Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/23/07. (jpp, )
May 15, 2007 23
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Dorsky, Jeremy Gilman, Leslie O. Murray, John T. Murray, Dennis E. Murray on behalf of Diane Swarberg t/w Certificates of Service and List of MDL Docket No. 1850 Cases. (vet, )
May 14, 2007 19
NOTICE by Menu Foods Holding Inc DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Hack, Susan)
May 10, 2007 18
NOTICE by Menu Foods Holding Inc re 1 Notice of Removal NOTICE OF ERRATA (Hack, Susan)
May 9, 2007 17
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Iams Company. (Howarth, Don)
May 7, 2007 16
Letter from atty Milberg Weiss re MDL 1850 (bar, )
May 2, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading. The Iams Company answer due on or before 05/29/07. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 05/01/07. (jpp, )
May 1, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER of transfer pursuant to Low-Number Rule. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz no longer assigned to case. New case number is 07CV0706-JAH(CAB). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 04/30/07. (jpp, )
April 27, 2007 9
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to File Responsive Pleading and Proof of Service by Menu Foods Holding Inc. (Hack, Susan)
April 25, 2007 8
NOTICE of Joinder by The Iams Company In Notice of Removal of Action (Howarth, Don)
April 18, 2007 3
NOTICE: Demand for Jury Trial by Menu Foods Holding, Inc. (vet, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swarberg v. Menu Foods Holding Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holding Inc
Represented By: Edward B Ruff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iams Company
Represented By: Don Howarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Swarberg
Represented By: John T. Murray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?