The United States of America v. 14.30 Acres of Land et al

Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Sheryl Lee Lichty, 14.30 Acres of Land, Timothy Lichty and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv00886
Filed: May 16, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258(a) Public Buildings & Property: Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 165 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert's Reports and Exclude Related Testimony. The Motion to Exclude the Second Supplemental Kauttu Report and related Expert Testimony of Kauttu is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 06/10/11. (cge)
May 10, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 111 Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Contention of Government Ownership of a Sixty Foot (60') Strip of Land Contiguous to and West of the Subject Property. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/10/2011. (jah) (jrl).
November 5, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 103 ) Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Mr. Stedt. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/5/09. (cap) (jrl).
January 30, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 75 the Government's Motion to Strike Defendant's Designation of Expert Witness Rosenthal and to Exclude the Rosenthal Expert Report and any related Expert Testimony by Rosenthal; (2) Granting the Government's Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Report and related Expert Testimony of Kauttu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/30/09. (cap) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. 14.30 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Lee Lichty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14.30 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lichty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?