Villavincencio et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Villavincencio, Jauve Villavincencio, Ana Gabriela Beltran, Adelita Ramos Aguirre and Rosalio Villavincencio
Defendant: United States of America, United States Customs and Border Protection, Tony Goncalves and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2007cv01024
Filed: June 5, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/30/09. (tkl) (av1).
January 28, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 joint Motion to modify scheduling order. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order by 3/17/09. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Trial shall commence on April 6, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. as previously ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/28/09. (tkl)
September 4, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 joint Motion to modify discovery schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/4/08. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villavincencio et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Villavincencio
Represented By: Charles Colin Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jauve Villavincencio
Represented By: Charles Colin Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Gabriela Beltran
Represented By: Charles Colin Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelita Ramos Aguirre
Represented By: Charles Colin Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalio Villavincencio
Represented By: Charles Colin Cossio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cindy M Cipriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Cindy M Cipriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Goncalves
Represented By: Cindy M Cipriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?