Nasirichampang v. Almager

Petitioner: Somchit Joy Nasirichampang
Respondent: Victor M Almager
Case Number: 3:2007cv01129
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Response to Petition: The Clerk shall serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on the Attorney General of California and a copy of this Order on the Petitioner. If a Motion to Dismiss is filed by Respondent, it is due 9/10/07. If M otion to Dismiss is filed, Respondent's opposition due 10/1/07. If motion to dismiss not filed, Answer is due 9/24/07. Respondent's Traverse due by 10/24/2007. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/27/2007. (Copies sent as ordered to Attorney General and Petitioner)(mjj) (bar).
July 23, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Clerk shall file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/23/2007. (mjj)(mam).
July 10, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice: To reopen case Petitioner must provide the Court with filing fee or adequate proof that Petitioner cannot pay filing fee by 9/10/07. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/10/2007. (mjj) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasirichampang v. Almager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Somchit Joy Nasirichampang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Victor M Almager
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?