Schroeder et al v. San Diego Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Schroeder and Marina Laneri Schroeder
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District, Fernando Ray Ortiz, Kimberly Chambers, Henry L Ortiz, Sylvia Ortiz and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01266
Filed: July 12, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 135 Motion for Order Establishing Special Needs Trust, granting 136 Motion for Settlement to Approve Compromise of Pending Action for Person w/ a Disability, and granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion to Strike Attorney Lien of Amy and Tom Vandeveld. The Vandevelds have a valid lien for $1,854.63 in costs, but are not entitled to any attys fees for their services in this case. Court will separately enter an order establishing the Special Needs Trust. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/12/2010. (jah)
May 13, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 84 Motion for Summary Adjudication. Denying Plaintiff's 105 Motion for Continuance under FRCP 56(f). Court grants Dfts' motion for summary adjudication of Pla's claim unde r 42 USC 1983 as to the District, Board, and individual Dfts in their official capacities, because Pla's claims are barred by the Eleventh Amendment. Court denies Dfts' motion for summary adjudication on the merits of Pla's claim under 42 USC 1983 against the individual Dfts in their individual capacities. Court grants Dfts' motion for summary adjudiciation of Pla's claim for punitive damages. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/13/2009. (jah) (jrl).
February 5, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Clerk directed to file Pla's Amended Complaint (Exhibit 1 to Pla's motion to amend [57-2]) and issue summonses for new Dfts Susan Skinner, Mike Jimenez, and Board of Education of the San Diego Unified School District. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/5/2009. (Summonses t/w copy of this Order and Amended Complaint mailed to Atty Jeffrey Weeks) (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder et al v. San Diego Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Schroeder
Represented By: Amy B Vandeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Laneri Schroeder
Represented By: Amy B Vandeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Ray Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry L Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?