Echostar Satellite LLC et al v. ViewTech Inc et al

Plaintiff: Echostar Satellite LLC, Echostar Technologies Corporation, , and Nagrastar LLC
Defendant: ViewTech Inc, Jung Kwak and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01273
Filed: July 13, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 165 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the sum of $214,898,600. Plaintiffs are entitled to permanent injunction and reasonable attorneys' fees and costs. Plaintiffs' ex parte motions to file certain audio recordings by disk and to file portions of an expert report identifying the locations of proprietary security codes within receivers are granted. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/20/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
February 15, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: The date and time of the Settlement Conference on February 24, 2011 at 9:00 AM is vacated and reset for June 14, 2011 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/15/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
February 5, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Viewtech's motion with respect to Count II (violation of 47 U.S.C. 605(a)), but denies the motion on all other counts. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/5/08. (aje)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echostar Satellite LLC et al v. ViewTech Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echostar Satellite LLC
Represented By: Alysson Russell Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echostar Technologies Corporation, ,
Represented By: Alysson Russell Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: Alysson Russell Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViewTech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Kwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?