Arnold v. Director of Corrections-Rehabilitation

Petitioner: Richard Allen Arnold
Respondent: Director of Corrections-Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2007cv01400
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 56 ; Arnold's request for an evidentiary hearing is denied; his request for counsel is also denied. his habeas petition is denied in its entirety; a Certificate of Appealability is denied; the Court therefore adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/18/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
February 1, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Petitioner's Request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Louisa S Porter on 2/1/08. (vrp)
October 4, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reopening Case and Setting Briefing Schedule. A copy of the Petition and a copy of this order have been served on Attorney General of State of California; and a copy of this order has been served on Petitioner. Signed by Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/03/07. (vrp)
August 9, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and with leave to amend. To have case re-opened, Petitioner must file a First Amended Petition no later than 10/08/07 and a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee. Blank IFP and First Amended Petition sent to Petitioner. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/9/07. (vrp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Director of Corrections-Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Allen Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of Corrections-Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?