Saraswati v. San Diego, County of et al

Plaintiff: Ranganath Saraswati
Defendant: San Diego, County of and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2007cv01415
Filed: August 3, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On March 6, 2012, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause (Doc. 46 ). To date, no party has responded to the Order to Show Cause. The Clerk of the Court shall administratively close this case without prejudice to any party and with leave to be immediately reopened without further order of this Court upon the filing of a notification that the mandamus proceedings have concluded by any party. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/22/2012. (mdc)
November 4, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Re Doc. 37 ): The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied and the Motion to Abstain and Further Stay or Dismiss Action filed by Defendant County of San Diego is granted. The Court stays this action pending resolution of the appeal in t he California Court of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District. Defendant County of San Diego shall file a status report with respect to the proceedings in the state appellate court 90 days from the date of this Order, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/4/2010. (mdc)
March 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court grants the Motion to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. 20 ) filed by Plaintiff Ranganath Saraswati. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/2/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saraswati v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranganath Saraswati
Represented By: Michael R Marrinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?