Halbert v. County of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Anthony C. Halbert
Defendant: County of San Diego, Geno Davis and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01607
Filed: August 14, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Case settled. Plaintiff's/Defendants counsel to submit papers within 45days. A Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on 8/31/2011 08:30 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo unless a signed stipulation for dismissal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/14/2011.(mtb)(jrd)
November 16, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting Amended Proposed Pretrial Order and Continuing Final Pretrial Conference. On November 15, 2010 this civil rights action came on for a pretrial conference. The amended proposed pretrial order dated November 5, 2010 is hereby Rejected. No later than November 29, 2010, Plaintiff shall deliver to chambers three copies of a fully executed revised proposed pretrial order. (Final Pretrial Conference continued to 12/6/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz.) Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/16/10.(lao)
March 30, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 84 Defendant Roger Rodriguez' Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 91 Defendant Sam Samoa's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Granting 83 Defendant Lester Eugene Davis and Joe Spina's Motion for Summary Judgment; an d Denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment: Det. Rodriguez motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The request in his reply for summary adjudication of issues is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/30/2010. (mjj)
April 15, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Defendant Sam Samoa's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/15/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halbert v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony C. Halbert
Represented By: Alvin Mark Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geno Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?