Mancini et al v. The Insurance Corporation of New York et al

Plaintiff: Carol Mancini and San Marino Plastering, Inc.
Defendant: The Insurance Corporation of New York and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01750
Filed: September 6, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 65 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Stay Proceedings: Defendant's ex parte motion to stay proceedings is DENIED with respect to plaintiffs first and second causes of action for breach of contract, and is GRANTED IN PART with respect to plaintiffs claims based on breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing. INSCORP shall within 30 days communicate this courts decision to the New York Supreme Court and the New York Superintendent of Insurance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the action shall proceed immediately as to plaintiffs breach of contract claims. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/15/2010. (mjj) (jrl).
June 23, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 61 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply: The Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief is DENIED; The Request to Strike the timely filed Reply Brief is DENIED; and The Request to Strike the Additional Lozano Declaration and Report is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court is directed to strike Docket Numbers 55 and 56. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/23/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
June 18, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; Granting in part and Denying in part 41 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories: It Is Hereby Ordered that The Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories is GRANTED and no later than July 13, 2009 Plaintiffs shall supplement their responses to the Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents as described herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than July 13, 2009 the parties shall submit a Joint Motion for Protective Order governing the use of confidential documents in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/18/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancini et al v. The Insurance Corporation of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mancini
Represented By: Ralph W Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Marino Plastering, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph W Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Insurance Corporation of New York
Represented By: Christopher lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?