Durham v. Continental

Plaintiff: Sallie A. Durham
Defendant: Continental Central Credit, San Clemente Cove Vacation Owners, Vacation Resorts International, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2007cv01763
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the action is Dismissed with Prejudice. (ecs)
June 2, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 87 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction over the enforcement of the settlement agreement. The pending 78 motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to file a motion for attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/2/11. (jer)
January 10, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 85 Ex Parte Joint Motion for Correction and (2) Modifying Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/10/11. (jer)
January 3, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 81 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The parties shall contact the chambers of the Hon. Barry T. Moskowitz without delay to schedule a hearing on the question of whether the proposed settlement should be finally approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate to the class. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/3/11. (jer)
July 14, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/14/10. (vet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Continental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallie A. Durham
Represented By: Deborah L Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Central Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Clemente Cove Vacation Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacation Resorts International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?