Daniels v. Alvarado et al

Plaintiff: Ted Darell Daniels
Defendant: O Alvarado, M Harris, A Roberts, W Mitchell and Robert J Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2007cv01822
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 52 ) Re: Granting (Doc. 44 ) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying (Doc. 37 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying Motion For Leave To Amend. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
November 17, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration for order denying appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/17/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
October 21, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting application to depose Plaintiff incarcerated individual 41 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/21/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
August 7, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
April 13, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Scheduling ORDER on plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment 29 . Responses due by 5/8/2009; Replies due by 5/29/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
March 9, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and denies Plaintiff's Objections. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/9/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Alvarado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Darell Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Alvarado
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Harris
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Roberts
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Mitchell
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?