Cram, et al., v. Electronic Data Systems Corporation, et al.,

Plaintiff: Joel M Cram
Defendant: Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv01842
Filed: September 20, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER And Dismissal With Prejudice: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court approves and adopts the parties' agreement that: (a) any otherwise-valid claim by any Initially-Identified Class Member will be deemed timely if postmarked on or before 12/31/2008, and (b) any otherwise-valid claim by any Subsequently-Identified Class Member will be deemed timely if postmarked on or before 1/9/2009; and such agreement shall be, and hereby is, deemed to be incorporated into the Stipulation for Settlement. The Court approves the Settlement as set forth in the Stipulation of Settlement. The Court enters a judgment of dismissal of the entire Action, with prejudice, as of the filing date of this Final Order, pursuant to the terms set fort h in the Stipulation of Settlement. The Court, therefore, orders the calculations and the payments to be made and administered in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation of Settlement to each person who submits a claim to the Claims Administrato r in accordance with the Stipulation of Settlement. If the Settlement does not become final and effective in accordance with the terms of the Stipulation of Settlement, then this final Order, the Preliminary Approval Order, and all orders entered in connection therewith shall be rendered null and void and shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/16/2009. (mdc)
February 5, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance, and Notice of Telephonic Case Management Conference. On 2/4/08, the Court convened an ENE Conference. A Case Management Conference is set for 3/28/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Failure of any counsel or party to comply with this Order will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/5/08. (vrp)
September 25, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference for 11/6/07 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom F before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.Signed by Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/25/07. (vrp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cram, et al., v. Electronic Data Systems Corporation, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel M Cram
Represented By: David J Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Data Systems Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?