Zeinali v. Raytheon Company et al

Plaintiff: Hossein Zeinali
Defendant: Raytheon Company and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2007cv01852
Filed: September 21, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE SECTION 1102.5(c) CLAIM: For reasons stated herein, the Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Raytheon Company as to Plaintiff Hossein Zeinali's California Labor Code section 1102.5(c) claim. The claim is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/7/2011. (amk)
June 29, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Disparate Treatment Claim: In sum, the undisputed evidence demonstrates that Zeinali unsuccessfully applied for eight promotions at Raytheon between August 2004 and January 2005. By April 2005, the last position was filled by an individual other than Zeinali. Zeinali did not file a complaint with DFEH until December 2006. Accordingly, to the extent Zeinali's disparate treatment claim is based on these eight non-promotions, it is barred by FEHA's one-year statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/29/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 8, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 joint motion to extend expert discovery deadlines as submitted; granting brief extension of dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/8/08. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeinali v. Raytheon Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossein Zeinali
Represented By: Reza Keramati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Represented By: John S Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?