Chavez et al v. WIS Holdings Corp et al

Plaintiff: Eduardo Chavez and Lynda Dreisbach
Defendant: WIS Holdings Corp and Washington Inventory Service
Case Number: 3:2007cv01932
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 257 Motion to Amend First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/21/2013. (sjt)
May 20, 2013 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resolving Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute and Granting 264 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/17/2013. (sjt)
June 7, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 182 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Attorney's Fees and Service Awards) filed by Eduardo Chavez, Tomas Soliz. The claims of the Californ ia Class Members are hereby dismissed with Prejudice. Without affecting the finality of this Order, the Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over this Proceeding to consider all further matters arising out of or in connection with: (a) the enforcement of this Order; (b) the enforcement of the Settlement Agreement; and (c) the distribution of the Settlement Fund or the payment of attorneys fees, costs, expenses or service awards. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/7/2010.(leh)
January 4, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 152 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Rule 23 Settlement; For Certification of Class, and for Permission to Disseminate Amended Notice to Class: A Final Fairness Hearing is set for 4/26/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/4/10.(mjj)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez et al v. WIS Holdings Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Chavez
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Dreisbach
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIS Holdings Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Inventory Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?