Politte et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Robert A. Politte, Joan M. Politte and TRKSS, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2007cv01950
Filed: October 4, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2012 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 362 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Plaintiffs request for stay is denied. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/10/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
May 25, 2012 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 340 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/25/12. (cge)
March 21, 2012 334 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Plaintiffs claim for refund under § 7426(a)(4) is denied. Plaintiffs motion, [Doc. No. 321], for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Rule 52(c) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure as to Defendants alter-ego determination is denied. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/21/12. (cge)
June 1, 2011 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Hearing on Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Witnesses Kevin Call and Carelton Knechtel re 258 Motion in Limine. The Court hereby grants Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7, to exclude from trial testimony of Plaintiffs' expert witness Carleton Knechtel and denies the motion as to Kevin Call. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 06/01/11. (cge) Modified on 6/2/2011 to correct ruling on motion (mam).
August 16, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding (Doc. 247 ) Order To Show Cause Against Plaintiffs And Denying (Doc. 248 ) Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/16/2010. (srm)
June 14, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: A Settlement Conference will be held June 30, 2010 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom F. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/2010.(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Politte et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Politte
Represented By: Scott L Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M. Politte
Represented By: Scott L Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRKSS, LLC
Represented By: Scott L Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?