April 12, 2010 |
Filing 61
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Vanginderen. (Copy: Atty Maint) (mdc)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing 60
Abstract of Judgment by Cornell University, entered against Kevin Vanginderen in the amount of $43,161.25.. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing 59
PRAECIPE by Cornell University to issue an Abstract of Judgment re 57 Clerk's Judgment (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjj)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 58
MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Vanginderen. (akr)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 57
CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants defendant Cornell University's motion for attorney's fees in the amount of $43,161.25(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
|
February 4, 2010 |
Filing 56
ORDER VACATING STAY: In an order filed on 12/31/08, the Court granted defendant Cornell University's motion for attorneys fees in the amount of $43,161.25. The Court stayed enforcement of the judgment pending Plaintiffs appeal. On 2/2/10, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued a mandate affirming the judgment of this Court. Therefore, the stay is VACATED. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/4/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(asw) (jrl).
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing 55
ORDER of USCA as to 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Vanginderen. Appellant's unopposed motion to consolidate Nos. 08-56020 and 09-55053 is granted. If appellant in 09-55053 has not already done so, within 14 days from the date of order, appellant shall correct the opening brief deficiency. Failure to do so may result in the automatic dismissal of the case. The remaining current briefing schedule in No. 09-55053 shall remain in effect. (akr)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing 54
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Vanginderen. (vet)
|
December 31, 2008 |
Filing 53
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards attorney's fees in the amount of $43,161.25. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. However, the Court stays enforcement of the judgment pending the appeal of this case. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/31/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(leh)
|
August 22, 2008 |
Filing 52
MINUTE ORDER submitting 38 Motion for Attorney Fees. Court to issue order. (ibf)
|
August 20, 2008 |
Filing 51
NOTICE: Motion Hearing scheduled for 8/22/08 11:00 AM before District Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is taken under submission. No appearances necessary. (ibf)
|
July 31, 2008 |
Filing 50
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 49 Reply in Further Support of Cornell's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Davidson, Clifford) (jpp).
|
July 31, 2008 |
Filing 49
REPLY re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clifford S. Davidson in Further Support of Cornell's Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Davidson, Clifford) (jpp).
|
July 28, 2008 |
Filing 48
RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kevin Vanginderen. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/24/08. (vet)
|
July 28, 2008 |
Filing 47
Discrepancy Order by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz accepting document: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees from Plaintiff Kevin Vanginderen, non-compliance with local rule 7.1 Missing table of contents. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(vet)
|
July 21, 2008 |
Filing 46
NOTICE of DUSCA Receipt of Certificate of Record re 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Vanginderen. USCA Case Number 08-56020. (asw)
|
July 8, 2008 |
Filing 45
Costs Taxed in amount of $ 738.00 against plaintiff Kevin Vanginderen (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(nsp)
|
July 3, 2008 |
Filing 44
Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA re 31 Notice of Appeal (asw)
|
July 3, 2008 |
Filing 43
Objection to Bill of Costs filed by Kevin Vanginderen. (vet)
|
July 3, 2008 |
Filing 42
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin Vanginderen re 31 Notice of Appeal: No Hearings Held. (asw)
|
July 2, 2008 |
Filing 41
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 40 Declaration, 39 Declaration (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
July 2, 2008 |
Filing 40
DECLARATION re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Clifford S. Davidson by Defendant Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C)(Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
July 2, 2008 |
Filing 39
DECLARATION re 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Bert H. Deixler by Defendant Cornell University. (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
July 2, 2008 |
Filing 38
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Cornell's Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
June 24, 2008 |
Filing 37
USCA Time Scheduling Order as to 31 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Vanginderen. (leh)
|
June 18, 2008 |
Filing 36
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 34 Notice (Other), 35 Declaration, 32 Bill of Costs (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
June 18, 2008 |
Filing 35
DECLARATION re 34 Notice (Other), 32 Bill of Costs of Clifford S. Davidson by Defendant Cornell University. (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
June 18, 2008 |
Filing 34
NOTICE by Cornell University to Plaintiff of Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs by Defendant Cornell University (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
June 18, 2008 |
Filing 33
NOTICE: A Bill of Costs 32 was filed by defendant Cornell University scheduling a hearing for July 8, 2008 at 10:00 am. Any opposition to this Bill of Costs is to be filed by 12:00 noon on Monday, July 7, 2008. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this hearing are to join on a conference call then contact N. Prewitt (619) 557-6415 at the time of the hearing. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(nsp)
|
June 18, 2008 |
Filing 32
BILL OF COSTS submitted by Defendant Cornell University in the amount of $ 1049. (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
June 13, 2008 |
Filing 31
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 28 Clerk's Judgment by Kevin Vanginderen. (Filing Fee: Paid, Receipt #151924) (leh)
|
June 13, 2008 |
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 31 Notice of Appeal. (leh)
|
June 4, 2008 |
Filing 30
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 29 Notice of Ruling and Entry of Judgment (Davidson, Clifford) (mkz).
|
June 4, 2008 |
Filing 29
NOTICE by Cornell University to Plaintiff of Ruling and Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Davidson, Clifford) (mkz).
|
June 4, 2008 |
Filing 28
CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (jpp)
|
June 3, 2008 |
Filing 27
ORDER granting 7 Special Motion to Strike. The Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Any motion for attorney's fee must be brought within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 06/03/08. (jpp)
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 26
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 25 Notice of Related Case (Davidson, Clifford) (vet).
|
April 28, 2008 |
Filing 25
NOTICE by Cornell University of related case(s) 08-cv-736-w-jma (Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 4/29/2008 - low-number order prepared (vet).
|
December 28, 2007 |
Filing 24
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 23 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) to Court of California Supreme Court Decision (Davidson, Clifford) (jpp, ).
|
December 27, 2007 |
Filing 23
NOTICE by Cornell University to Court of California Supreme Court Decision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (California Supreme Court decision in the Hebrew Academy case))(Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 12/28/2007 - atty contacted missing proof of service (vet, ).
|
December 21, 2007 |
Filing 22
MINUTE ORDER submitting 7 Motion to Strike (tml)
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 21
RESPONSE to Defendant's Reply in further support re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kevin Vanginderen. NUNC PRO TUNC 12/18/07. (vet)
|
December 20, 2007 |
Filing 20
Discrepancy Order by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz accepting document: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Reply from Plaintiff Kevin Vanginderen, non-compliance with local rule Other: No Provision for Surreplies in the Local Rules. Signed by Clerk of Court on 12/19/07. (vet)
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 19
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 16 Declaration, 17 Declaration, 18 Objection, 15 Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure (Deixler, Bert) (vet, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 18
OBJECTION by Cornell University re 12 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure (Deixler, Bert) (vet, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 17
DECLARATION of Clifford S. Davidson in support re 15 Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure by Defendant Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deixler, Bert) Modified on 12/17/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 16
DECLARATION of Simeon F. Moss in support re 15 Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure by Defendant Cornell University. (Deixler, Bert) Modified on 12/17/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
December 14, 2007 |
Filing 15
REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cornell University. (Deixler, Bert) (vet, ).
|
December 12, 2007 |
Filing 14
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 13 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice (Deixler, Bert) (vet, ).
|
December 12, 2007 |
Filing 13
NOTICE of Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice by Cornell University re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit E# 2 Exhibit Exhibit F# 3 Declaration Declaration of Nelson E. Roth in Support of Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Deixler, Bert) Modified on 12/12/2007 at request of atty to add document text (mjj, )
|
November 21, 2007 |
Filing 12
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kevin Vanginderen. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin Vanginderen in support of memorandum of points and authorities)(vet)
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 11
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 10 Declaration of Valerie Cross Dorn (Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 11/8/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
November 7, 2007 |
Filing 10
DECLARATION of Valerie Cross Dorn in further support re 8 Notice: Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected exhibit D)(Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 11/8/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint, 8 Notice (Other) (Deixler, Bert) Modified on 11/5/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 8
NOTICE: Request for Judicial Notice in support re 7 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint by Cornell University (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits in Support of Special Motion to Strike# 2 Declaration of Valerie Cross Dorn in Support of Request for Judicial Notice# 3 Declaration of Anne Richardson Kenney in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)(Deixler, Bert) Modified on 11/5/2007 - edited text (vet, ).
|
November 2, 2007 |
Filing 7
MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint by Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Pro. sec. 425.16)(Deixler, Bert) (vet, ).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Scott Davidson on behalf of Cornell University (Davidson, Clifford) (vet, ).
|
November 1, 2007 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson Eugene Roth on behalf of Cornell University (Roth, Nelson) (vet, ).
|
October 31, 2007 |
Filing 4
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Charles S. Sims appearing for Defendant Cornell University (mkz)(mam).
|
October 30, 2007 |
Filing 3
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cornell University (Davidson, Clifford) Modified on 11/1/2007 - atty not associated w/ party and signature is in incorrect format, atty contacted (vet, ).
|
October 29, 2007 |
Filing 2
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Cornell University. (vet)
|
October 29, 2007 |
Filing 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL as to Kevin Vanginderen from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2007-00076496-CU-DF-SC. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt number 143754), filed by Cornell University. t/w Notice of Party with Financial Interest.(pdc)(bar).
|