Shames et al v. Hertz Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Michael Shames and Gary Gramkow
Defendant: Hertz Corporation, Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc., Avis Budget Group, Inc., Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Fox Rent A Car, Inc., Coast Leasing Corp., The California Travel and Tourism Commission and Caroline Bateta
Case Number: 3:2007cv02174
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 383 Motion for FRAP 7 Appeal Bond. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that the posting of an appeal bond is warranted and the amount of $15,000.00 requested by Class Counsel is reasonable. By 7/10/2013, Objectors G ordon Hansmeier; Thomas Lavery; and Cery Perle, Gary Bishop, Frank de Julius, and Andrew Cesare must either post a $15,000 bond or file a notice of dismissal of their appeal. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/18/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).
November 5, 2012 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 327 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and For Entry of Judgment, 328 Motion for Attorney Fees; and Judgment and Dismissal: This Court Approves the settlement and Orders the parties to effectuate the settlem ent agreement according to its terms. The Court Dismisses this case on the merits and with prejudice, pursuant to the terms of the parties settlement agreement. If this Judgment and the settlement do not become final and effective in accord with th e terms of the settlement agreement, then this Judgment and all orders entered in connection therewith shall be deemed null and void and shall be vacated. The Court shall not retain continuing jurisdiction over implementation of the settlement or future disputes over construing, enforcing, or administering the settlement. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/5/2012. (leh)
October 15, 2012 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 341 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/15/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 22, 2012 313 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, Appointing Class Representative and Lead Counsel, and Providing For Notice re: 310 MOTION for Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Certification Of Settlement Class, Appointment Of Class Representative And Class Counsel And Approval Of Form And Manner Of Giving Not filed by Gary Gramkow. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/22/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 21, 2012 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER preliminarily approving settlement, certifying settlement class, appointing class representative and lead counsel, and providing for notice. A hearing (the "Final Approval Hearing") shall be held before this Court on October 29, 2012, at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/21/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
February 23, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 191 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Without Prejudice to Re-File. For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice. In addition, the Court orders that the stay imposed in this action is hereby lifted. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/23/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shames et al v. Hertz Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shames
Represented By: Donald G Rez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gramkow
Represented By: Donald G Rez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Rent A Car, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Leasing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Travel and Tourism Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Bateta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?