George v. Almager et al

Petitioner: Richard Earl George
Respondent: V M Almager and District Court of California, Southern District
Case Number: 3:2007cv02215
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 28 Petitioner's Application for Certificate of Appealability; granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Court GRANTS Petitioner's Application as to Claim 1. The Court DENIES Petitioner's Application as to Claims 2, 3, 4, and 5. Additionally, the Court GRANTS Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/10/2009. (USCA Case No. 09-56835. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
September 24, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 15 Report and Recommendations denying Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254 in its entirety and denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 09/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb)(jrl).
December 17, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requiring Response to Petition. Respondent shall file a motion to dismiss no later than January 28, 2008 and Petitioner shallfile his opposition, if any, to the motion no later than February 19, 2008 OR Respondent shall file and serve an answer no later than February 11, 2008 and Petitioner may file a traverse no later than March 11, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo S. Papas on 12/17/07. (aje)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Almager et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Earl George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: V M Almager
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Court of California, Southern District
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?