Kodimer et al v. City of Escondido et al

Plaintiff: Henry Kodimer and Lyn Ramskill
Defendant: City of Escondido, County of San Diego, Officer Wyse, Officer Umstot, Sergeant Distel and Doe Defendants 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2007cv02221
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Claims Brought Under 42 U.S.C. 1983. The Rule 50(a) motion to dismiss as a matter of law is granted in favor of all Defendants for each of the § 1983 claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/1/2011.(knh)
July 22, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 89 ) Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/22/2010. (srm)
June 30, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is denied as to defendants Tanacio, West, and the County of San Diego. Summary Judgment is granted in favor of defendant Goldstein on all claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/30/2010. (knh)(jrl).
January 8, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 joint Motion to Continue pretrial dates to 4/5/2010 at 10:30 a.m. Mem of Fact and Law by 3/15/2010. Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order by 3/29/2010. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/7/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 7, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference to March 11, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/7/2010. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kodimer et al v. City of Escondido et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Kodimer
Represented By: Richard T Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyn Ramskill
Represented By: Richard T Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Escondido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Umstot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Distel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?