Pressly v. Haws

Petitioner: Stuart S Pressly
Respondent: F B Haws
Case Number: 3:2007cv02315
Filed: December 18, 2007
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting The Report And Recommendation; (2) Denying The Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (Re Doc. 28 ): This Court adopts the Report And Recommendation and denies Pressly's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and dismisses the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (av1).
September 30, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Stuart S Pressly be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2009 Replies due by 10/30/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 09/30/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb) (jrl).
March 20, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 3/23/09. This Court adopts Magistrate Judge Adler's Report and Recommendation and denies Petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance 13 . (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 13, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance 13 be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 2/13/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pressly v. Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stuart S Pressly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F B Haws
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?