Hildes v. Andersen

Plaintiff: David Hildes
Defendant: Arthur Andersen
Case Number: 3:2008cv00008
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2015 160 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that whether equitable or statutory tolling, American Pipe tolling may not be extended to Section 13's statute of repose. Accordingly, Hildes' Section 11 claim is barred by the three-year statute of repose. Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. As this is Hildes' only remaining claim, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice.(kcm)
April 16, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Staying Proceedings 138 ; and (2) Denying as Moot 135 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Case stayed until pending the Supreme Court's disposition of Police & Fire Retirement System of City of Detroit v. IndyMac MBS, Inc. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/16/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
November 8, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Arthur Andersen's 51 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/5/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
July 19, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant Arthur Anderson's 2 Motion to Dismiss Counts II, III and V; (2) Granting 16 Motion of outside Directors for Leave to Intervene for Limited Purpose; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint no later than August 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hildes v. Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hildes
Represented By: Andrew Dawn Stillufsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Andersen
Represented By: David L Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?