Strasburg v. M/Y Just a Notion et al

Plaintiff: Gregory A. Strasburg
Defendant: M/Y Just a Notion, Peter Blair, Jim Singleton and The Yacht Club, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00021
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 180 Motion to Alter Judgment or Amend the Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/26/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 18, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Peter Blair's 147 Motion for Continuance. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
January 25, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Date and Related Deadlines: all dates and deadlines remain as currently set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 30, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting 108 Peter Blair's Motion for Reconsideration and (2) denying leave to amend: The Court denies Peter Blair leave to amend his answer and assert counterclaims. This Court's Order dated 8/25/09 remains in full effect.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/30/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strasburg v. M/Y Just a Notion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Strasburg
Represented By: James W Alcantara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Just a Notion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Yacht Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?