T.B. et al v. San Diego Unified School District

Plaintiff: Tyler Brenneise, Allison Brenneise and Robert Brenneise
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2008cv00028
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 241 Motion for Reconsideration on Amount of Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/13/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 8, 2012 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying 208 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Granting 209 Motion for Summary Judgment on Fourth, Fifth, and Seventh Claims. Based on the foregoing reasons, the Court Grants the San Diego Unified School District's Motion for Summary Judgment on the fourth, fifth, and seventh causes of action and Denies the Brenneises' motion for partial summary judgment on their fourthclaim for relief in the Second Amended Complaint. This Order resolves all remaining claims. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in accordance herewith. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/8/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 18, 2011 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 198 Motion for Leave to Refile Motion and for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court denies Defendant's application to the extent Defendant desires to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings in add ition to its anticipated motion for summary judgment on the section 504 and ADA claims. The Court grants Defendant's application to the extent it intends to include the arguments raised in its prior motion for judgment on the pleadings within it s summary judgment motion. Lastly, the Court grants Defendant's request to increase the page limitation on its upcoming summary judgment motion, and increases the page limitation on Defendant's opening brief to 50 pages, and increases the l imitation on Defendant's reply brief to 25 pages. It is further ordered that the page limitation for Plaintiffs' opposition brief to Defendant's motion for summary judgment is increased from 25 pages to 50 pages. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)(jrd)
March 30, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and Compensatory Education. For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies the motion for an award of compensatory education and denies the motion for entry of partial final judgment. It is further ordered that within 3 days of the filing of this Order, the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge William McCurine's Chambers to schedule a case management conference. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/30/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 8, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a second amended complaint including proposed additional claims 4, 5, 6, and 7 against the School Dis trict. However, any amendment adding claim 8 against the Director in her individual capacity under Title II of the ADA or Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act would be futile, as there is no individual liability for damages under these two statutes. Plaintiffs' may file a second amended complaint in compliance with the Court's order on or before May 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/8/2009. (amk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.B. et al v. San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Brenneise
Represented By: Steven Wyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Brenneise
Represented By: Steven Wyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brenneise
Represented By: Steven Wyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?