in re: Mission Bay Jet Sports, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Mission Bay Jet Sports, LLC and Robert Adamson
Defendant: Unknown, -
Case Number: 3:2008cv00146
Filed: January 24, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 the motion to limit products liability discovery and proof at the time of the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
January 11, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses; Denying 69 Motion to Dismiss prayer for punitive damages; Denying 70 Motion to Strike prayer for Attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/11/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).
September 9, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Claimants Bomardier Recreational Products Inc. and BRP US Inc's motion to enlarge time to file answer and claim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/1/09. Answer and claim deemed filed 8/21/09. Answer of Mission Bay and Adamson filed as of 8/21/09.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
September 2, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Stay enforcement of judgment pending appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/2/08. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: in re: Mission Bay Jet Sports, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Bay Jet Sports, LLC
Represented By: Rocky K Copley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?