Parra v. Hernandez et al

Plaintiff: Victor Parra, Jr
Defendant: R Hernandez, R Limon, W Liles, A L Cota, P. Cowan and CDCR
Case Number: 3:2008cv00191
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss certain claims for failure to exhaust and grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
November 13, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment claims set forth in his fourth and fifth causes of action. The Court grants the motion to dismiss Plaintiffs state law claims set forth in his sixth cause of action and brought pursuant to Title 15 of the California Code of Regulations sections 3343 and 3322 and California Penal Code section 673. The Court denies without prejudice the motion to dismiss Plaintiffs state law claim set forth in his seventh cause of action and brought pursuant to California Civil Code section 52.1. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).
March 24, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 19 Report and Recommendations and adopting in part 40 Report and Recommendations. granting in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part 39 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may submit an amended complaint remedying the highlighted deficiencies no later than 05/04/2009. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parra v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Parra, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Limon
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Liles
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A L Cota
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Cowan
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?