Goudlock v. Hernandez et al

Plaintiff: Jacie Lee Goudlock, Jr.
Defendant: Robert Hernandez, Silvia H Garcia, Thompson and Unknown, -
Case Number: 3:2008cv00204
Filed: February 1, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as modified; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 70 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/13/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) Modified to correct typo on 3/13/2012 (cge).
March 29, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation denying Defendant Thompson's Motion to Dismiss as Moot; and Granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint re 52 , 53 , 59 . Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint no later then 30 days after the date of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 10, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/10/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 13, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant Cruz Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/12/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 15, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting Defendant Peterson's 23 Motion to Dismiss: The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation in its entirety and GRANTS Defendant Peterson's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claim for damages against her without leave to amend. Count two of the Amended Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw)(jrl).
August 4, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Recommending Defendant Petersen's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 9/7/2009 Replies due by 9/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/4/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(asw) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goudlock v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacie Lee Goudlock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hernandez
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia H Garcia
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?