Abdolazade v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jaleh Abdolazade
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv00240
Filed: February 6, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 joint Motion and Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/27/09. (tkl) (Additional attachment(s) (document image) added on 8/28/2009: # 1 Main Document) (tkl) (kaj).
March 11, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying scheduling order regulating discovery and other pretrial proceedings 26 . Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/24/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2009. Trial set for 9/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom H before Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/11/09. (tkl) (jrl).
February 3, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/3/09. The court grants Plaintiff's motion to substitute Shabaz Rahbari as counsel or record. Former counsel Allan Cate is relieved of all obligations and responsibilities in this matter. (tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdolazade v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaleh Abdolazade
Represented By: Allan Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?