Bass v. Cate

Petitioner: Robert C Bass
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 3:2008cv00274
Filed: February 11, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Riverside
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Reconsider Denial of Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/9/2009. (USCA Case No. 09-56637. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
September 9, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court denies the Objections and adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety.(tkl) (kaj).
January 12, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/12/09. The court denies Petitioner's motion to alter or amend the order granting Respondents a 30 day extension of time. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert C Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?