Dilts et al v. Penske Logistics, LLC., et al

Plaintiff: Mickey Lee Dilts, Ray Rios and Donny Dushaj
Defendant: Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co LP and Does 1 though 25
Case Number: 3:2008cv00318
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2017 382 Opinion or Order of the Court Final Approval of Class Settlement and Awards of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Class Representative Payments [Doc. No. 376 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/16/2017. (jjg)
April 28, 2017 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Joint Motion to Provide Notice of Decertification to Class Members [Doc. No. 374 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/28/2017. (jjg)
October 31, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion to Append Order granting Partial Summary Judgment; (2) Setting Status Hearing: The parties SHALL APPEAR before this Court on 12/8/11 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6. The parties SHALL BE PREPARED to discuss their plans for moving this case to a full conclusion, including setting the necessary pre-trial dates. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/31/11. (lmt)(jrd)
July 21, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel: the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to compel Defendants to comply with the document requests on or before 7/27/11. Plaintiffs' request "that the Court enter an Order specifically compelling Defendants to respond to the interrogatories at issue" is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/21/11. (lmt)(jrd)
April 26, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Class Certification. Court certifies the proposed class and subclasses. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed subclass definition for the Section 17200 subclass within 14 days of the date this Order is docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/26/2010. (jah) (jrl).
October 23, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Class Certification: If Plaintiffs wish to file a renewed motion for class certification addressing the deficiencies identified by the Court, they shall file their motion within sixty days of the date this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/23/09. (pdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilts et al v. Penske Logistics, LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey Lee Dilts
Represented By: Michael D Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Rios
Represented By: Michael D Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Dushaj
Represented By: Michael D Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Logistics LLC
Represented By: Randy Scott Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co LP
Represented By: Randy Scott Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 though 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?