Haygood v. Knowles et al
Petitioner: |
Darrow Haygood |
Respondent: |
Mike Knowles and Bill Lockyer |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv00374 |
Filed: |
April 7, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
Habeas Corpus (General) Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Houston |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara Lynn Major |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER overruling Petitioner's objections; adopting 37 Report and Recommendation; and denying First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus in its entirety. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/08/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
25
ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 20 Report and Recommendations; Overruling Petitioner's 22 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations; Denying 18 Motion for Stay and Abeyance; and Advising Petitioner of his Further Options for Proceedings in this Case: If Petitioner fails to choose one of these options listed in this Order by 10/30/09, this Court will dismiss the petition without prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 9/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mkz)(kaj).
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for order denying 13 motion to stay proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2009, Replies due by 3/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 01/26/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jpp)
|
March 5, 2008 |
Filing
3
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/5/2008. Court dismisses the Petition w/o prejudice for failure to 1.) pay the $5.00 filing fee or move for IFP, 2.) name a proper respondent, and 3.) submit application for writ of hab eas corpus on court-approved form. If Petitioner wishes to proceed w/ case, Petitioner must file First Amended Petition t/w copy of this Order and $5.00 filing fee or adequate proof of inability to pay fee by 4/29/2008. Case is closed. Blank copy of First Amended Petition and Motion for IFP t/w copy of this Order mailed to Petitioner. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?