Juarez v. Autozone Stores, INC

Plaintiff: Rosario Juarez
Defendant: Autozone Stores, INC and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2008cv00417
Filed: March 5, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Defendant's Motion to Strike plaintiff's untimely Designation of Expert Psychiatrist, Dominick Addario, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/12/2011. (mtb)(jrd)
April 21, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Compel Without Prejudice. If, after deposing witnesses and conducting further discovery, Defendant believes that Plaintiffs mental state is in controversy and good cause exists to conduct an independent mental examination of Plaintiff, Defendant may renew its motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/21/2011. (mtb)
September 3, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend; Denying Without Prejudice 48 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and Referring Case to the Magistrate Judge for Further Case Management: No later than September 13, 2010, Pla intiff shall file and serve the proposed second amended complaint she filed as an exhibit in support of her motion. Defendant may respond to the amended complaint no later than within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). This case is REFERRED to the Hon. Barbara L. Major for further pre-trial case management. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/3/2010. (mjj)
August 26, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Joint Motion to Continue Dates: The Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2009 at 9:30 AM is continued to 10/26/2009 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/25/2009. (mjj) (av1).
February 5, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Settlement Conference: Granting 35 Motion to Continue. The Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2009 is reset for 5/18/2009 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. If the case is settled in its entirety before the scheduled date of the conference, counsel and any unrepresented parties must still appear in person, unless a written joint notice confirming the complete settlement of the case is filed no fewer than twenty-four (24) hours before the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/5/2009. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Autozone Stores, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Juarez
Represented By: Gregg C Sindici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores, INC
Represented By: Sean D Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?