Bryant

Plaintiff: James Bryant
Defendant: Amtrak and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2008cv00458
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 85 ) Motion to Enforce Settlement and Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice is granted. No later than 14 days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall pay Plaintiff the sum of money stated in the Memorandum of Settlement and file a notice with the Court certifying that the money has been paid. Thereafter, the Court will dismiss this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Atty Robert D. Donaldson.) (mdc)
July 23, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Re Doc. 68 ): The Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is granted. No later than 14 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file the proposed second amended complaint which is attached to the Motion for Leave to F ile a Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff does not file the second amended complaint within fourteen days, the Court will order this case to be closed. All remaining dates and deadlines set in the Second Amended Case Management Conference Order (Doc. 64 ), including the final pretrial conference date of 8/30/2010, are vacated. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/23/2010. (mdc)
May 25, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 54 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. No later than 20 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, accompanie d by a proposed second amended complaint. If Plaintiff does not file a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint within twenty days, the Court will order this case to be closed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/25/2010. (mdc) (jrl).
June 15, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark-Robert Bluemel is relieved as counsel only upon the condition that Mr. Bluemel refund Mr Bryant the $1,500 retainer. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is continued to 07/13/09 at 8:30am. Oppositions due 6/29/09.. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 06/15/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(bjb) (jrl)
June 9, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Depose Plaintiff and Move for Summary Judgment; The Case Management Conference Order filed 7/14/09 is amended as follows: No Memoranda of Law of Contentions of Fact are to be filed unle ss so ordered by this Court; Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 10/19/2009. Counsel shall confer and take the action required by Local Rule 16.1(f)(4) on or before 10/30/09; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Napoleon A. Jones Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/9/09. (ksr)
May 14, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Amtrak may depose Plaintiff in this matter on or before June 1, 2009 and may serve and file its contemplated motion for summary judgment against Plaintiff on or before June 15,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 05/14/09. (bjb) (jrl).
April 6, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks:Granting 10 Motion for Discovery. Bryant is also ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $325.00 to Defendant no later than August 7, 2009. (Tape #RBB09-10:00-10:21.)(Plaintiff Attorney Mark-Robert Bluemel).(Defendant Attorney Robert Donaldson(telephonically)). (bjb)
March 20, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Defendant Additional Time Within Which to Depose Plaintiff and Move for Summary Judgment. It is ordered that Amtrak may depose Plaintiff in this matter by May 15, 2009, and may serve and file its contemplated motion for summary judgment against Plaintiff by June 1, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 3/20/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bryant
Represented By: Mark-Robert Bluemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?