Clark v. Chase Home Finance, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Clark and James Renick
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, James Boudreau and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv00500
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 joint Motion for the dismissal with prejudice of the claims of Plaintiff James Renick. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/26/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (av1).
June 24, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 joint Motion to hold plaintiff James Renick's deposition after the discovery cut-off, on July 22, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
June 3, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 joint Motion to hold plaintiff James Renick's deposition after the discovery cut-off. It is ordered that (1) the deposition of Plaintiff James Renick shall go forward on June 23, 2009, and (2) the deadline for filing of a motion for summary judgment has been moved to August 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
April 16, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing action with prejudice as to plaintiffs Christopher Clark and Victor Whitaker 55 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/16/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
January 28, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 joint Motion for Stipulated Protective Order re use of confidential information as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Chase Home Finance, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Clark
Represented By: Gregory A Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Renick
Represented By: Gregory A Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Erin M Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Boudreau
Represented By: Erin M Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?